This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/05/2019 at 06:08:21 (UTC).

Felicia Cipolla, et al v. Team Enterprises, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Felicia Cipolla filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Team Enterprises, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15964

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

TEAM ENTERPRISES, LLC

NEW TEAM, LLC, DBA Team Enterprises

Plaintiff / Appellees

ALEXIS WOOD

FELICIA CIPOLLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Yesenia Garcia Perez Esquire

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

1255 Treat Boulevard, Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

William Hays Weissman Esquire

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

1255 Treat Boulevard, Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Edward Wynne

Attorney at Wynne Law Firm

80 E. Sir Francis Drake Boulevard, Suite 3G

Larkspur, CA 94939

George Nemiroff

Attorney at Law Office of Kenneth C. Absalom

220 Montgomery Street, Suite 905

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#1

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #2

Docketing Letter

1 #3

Counsel Case Information Packet

1 #4

Mediation Letter/Questionnaire

#2

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 07/03/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 07/02/2019 ). [11330304] (BS) [Entered: 06/13/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 07/02/2019, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11328244] (BS) [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/04/2019, 10:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11303509] (BS) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/13/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11296021] (AD) [Entered: 05/13/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Team Enterprises, LLC and New Team, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/13/2019. [11295541] [19-15964] (Garcia Perez, Yesenia) [Entered: 05/13/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/13/2019. Transcript ordered by 06/03/2019. Transcript due 07/02/2019. Appellants New Team, LLC and Team Enterprises, LLC opening brief due 08/12/2019. Appellees Felicia Cipolla and Alexis Wood answering brief due 09/10/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11287067] (HC) [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New Team LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Joseph Wynne