This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/27/2022 at 06:05:21 (UTC).

Feds for Medical Freedom v. Biden

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 Feds for Medical Freedom filed an Other lawsuit against Biden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-40043

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Feds for Medical Freedom

Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees

Highland Engineering, Incorporated

Raymond A. Beebe, Jr.

John Armbrust

Defendant / Appellants

Joseph R. Biden, Jr., in his official capacity as President of the United States

United States of America

Department of Transportation

Janet Yellen, in her official as Secretary of Treasury

Pete Buttigieg, in his official capacity as Secretary of Transportation

Amicus Curiae

America First Legal Foundation

45 Members of Congress

57 Members of Congress

Isaac McLaughlin

Gabriel Escoto

Michelle Ruth Morton

Waddie Burt Jones

Ryan Charles Biggers

Carole Leann Mezzacapo

Edward Bryan Surgeon

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

R. Trent McCotter

Jared Kelson

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

James Garland Gillingham

Casen Ross

Sarah Wendy Carroll

Charles Wylie Scarborough

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Gene Patrick Hamilton

Jordan E. Pratt

John Julian Vecchione

Other Attorneys

Lowell Harrison Becraft Esq. Jr.

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-40043] (Jared Kelson ) [Entered: 03/07/2022 09:32 AM]

Open Document

PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Amicus Brief filed by Amici Curiae James Rodden, Mr. Isaac McLaughlin, Mr. Gabriel Escoto, Ms. Michelle Ruth Morton, Mr. Waddie Burt Jones, Mr. Ryan Charles Biggers, Ms. Carole Leann Mezzacapo, Mr. Edward Bryan Surgeon, Ms. Susan Reynolds, Mr. Roy Kenneth Egbert, Mr. George Gammon, Ms. Doris Forshee, Mr. John Luff, Ms. April Hanson, Mr. Dan Parente and Mr. Steve Hanley in 22-40043 [ # 9780505-2 ]. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/25/2022 for Amici Curiae Ryan Charles Biggers, Roy Kenneth Egbert, Gabriel Escoto, Doris Forshee, George Gammon, Steve Hanley, April Hanson, Waddie Burt Jones, John Luff, Isaac McLaughlin, Carole Leann Mezzacapo, Michelle Ruth Morton, Dan Parente, Susan Reynolds, James Rodden and Edward Bryan Surgeon. [22-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 02/24/2022 12:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-40043] (Lowell Harrison Becraft Jr.) [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:30 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Mr. Pete Buttigieg, Department of Transportation, USA and Janet Yellen to the 28j Letter filed by Appellees Mr. John Armbrust, Mr. Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Feds for Medical Freedom, Highland Engineering, Incorporated and Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees [ # 9781468-2 ] Date of Service: 02/23/2022 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Becraft, Hamilton, Pratt, Vecchione; Attorney for Appellants: Carroll, Gillingham, Ross, Scarborough; Attorney for Appellee: McCotter [22-40043] (Charles Wylie Scarborough ) [Entered: 02/23/2022 03:22 PM]

Open Document #2

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document #1

Amicus Curiae Brief Filed

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #1

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document #2

Motion to file amicus brief

Open Document #1

Motion to File a Brief as Amicus

Open Document #2

Ex. A

Open Document #1

Rule 28(j) Material Filed

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Barksdale, Stewart, Dennis. Arguing Person Information Updated for: R. Trent McCotter arguing for Appellee John Armbrust, Appellee Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Appellee Feds for Medical Freedom, Appellee Incorporated Highland Engineering; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Charles Wylie Scarborough arguing for Appellant Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Appellant Pete Buttigieg, Appellant Department of Transportation, Appellant United States of America [22-40043] (SME) [Entered: 03/08/2022 09:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jared Kelson for party(s) Appellee Raymond A. Beebe Jr. Appellee John Armbrust Appellee Feds for Medical Freedom Appellee Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees Appellee Highland Engineering, Incorporated, in case 22-40043 [22-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 03/08/2022 08:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-40043] (Jared Kelson ) [Entered: 03/07/2022 09:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketPaper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae Institute for Health Research in 22-40043 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [22-40043] (DMS) [Entered: 02/24/2022 02:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketPaper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Amici Curiae James Rodden, Mr. Isaac McLaughlin, Mr. Gabriel Escoto, Ms. Michelle Ruth Morton, Mr. Waddie Burt Jones, Mr. Ryan Charles Biggers, Ms. Carole Leann Mezzacapo, Mr. Edward Bryan Surgeon, Ms. Susan Reynolds, Mr. Roy Kenneth Egbert, Mr. George Gammon, Ms. Doris Forshee, Mr. John Luff, Ms. April Hanson, Mr. Dan Parente and Mr. Steve Hanley in 22-40043 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [22-40043] (DMS) [Entered: 02/24/2022 02:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Lowell Harrison Becraft Jr. for Amicus Curiae Institute for Health Research in 22-40043 [22-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 02/24/2022 02:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Amicus Brief filed by Amici Curiae James Rodden, Mr. Isaac McLaughlin, Mr. Gabriel Escoto, Ms. Michelle Ruth Morton, Mr. Waddie Burt Jones, Mr. Ryan Charles Biggers, Ms. Carole Leann Mezzacapo, Mr. Edward Bryan Surgeon, Ms. Susan Reynolds, Mr. Roy Kenneth Egbert, Mr. George Gammon, Ms. Doris Forshee, Mr. John Luff, Ms. April Hanson, Mr. Dan Parente and Mr. Steve Hanley in 22-40043 [ # 9780505-2 ]. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/25/2022 for Amici Curiae Ryan Charles Biggers, Roy Kenneth Egbert, Gabriel Escoto, Doris Forshee, George Gammon, Steve Hanley, April Hanson, Waddie Burt Jones, John Luff, Isaac McLaughlin, Carole Leann Mezzacapo, Michelle Ruth Morton, Dan Parente, Susan Reynolds, James Rodden and Edward Bryan Surgeon. [22-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 02/24/2022 12:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-40043] (Lowell Harrison Becraft Jr.) [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketPaper copies of Appellant Reply Brief filed by Appellants USA, Department of Transportation, Mr. Pete Buttigieg, Janet Yellen and Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr. in 22-40043 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [22-40043] (LEF) [Entered: 02/23/2022 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Mr. Pete Buttigieg, Department of Transportation, USA and Janet Yellen to the 28j Letter filed by Appellees Mr. John Armbrust, Mr. Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Feds for Medical Freedom, Highland Engineering, Incorporated and Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees [ # 9781468-2 ] Date of Service: 02/23/2022 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Becraft, Hamilton, Pratt, Vecchione; Attorney for Appellants: Carroll, Gillingham, Ross, Scarborough; Attorney for Appellee: McCotter [22-40043] (Charles Wylie Scarborough ) [Entered: 02/23/2022 03:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Mr. Pete Buttigieg, Department of Transportation, USA and Janet Yellen advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [22-40043] (ABT) [Entered: 01/28/2022 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. R. Trent McCotter for Mr. John Armbrust, Mr. Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Feds for Medical Freedom, Highland Engineering, Incorporated and Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-40043] (R. Trent McCotter ) [Entered: 01/28/2022 03:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Mr. Pete Buttigieg, Department of Transportation, USA and Janet Yellenfor the Court to process. Date of service: 01/28/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Carroll, Gillingham, Ross; Attorney for Appellee: McCotter. [22-40043] (Casen Ross ) [Entered: 01/28/2022 02:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Casen Ross for party(s) Appellant USA Appellant Joseph R. Biden Jr. Appellant Department of Transportation Appellant Janet Yellen Appellant Pete Buttigieg, in case 22-40043 [22-40043] (NFD) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Sarah Wendy Carroll for party(s) Appellant USA Appellant Joseph R. Biden Jr. Appellant Department of Transportation Appellant Janet Yellen Appellant Pete Buttigieg, in case 22-40043 [22-40043] (ABT) [Entered: 01/28/2022 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-40043] (Sarah Wendy Carroll ) [Entered: 01/27/2022 09:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-40043] (Casen Ross ) [Entered: 01/27/2022 09:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9763483-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 02/10/2022 for Appellants Joseph R. Biden Jr., Pete Buttigieg, Department of Transportation, United States of America and Janet Yellen [22-40043] (SDH) [Entered: 01/26/2022 11:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketPARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [22-40043] (ABT) [Entered: 01/26/2022 10:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Mr. Pete Buttigieg, Department of Transportation, USA and Janet Yellen [22-40043] (ABT) [Entered: 01/26/2022 09:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less