Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 06:03:13 (UTC).

Federal Trade Commission v. Luke Chadwick

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Federal Trade Commission filed an Other lawsuit against Luke Chadwick. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2387

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

BG MARKETING, LLC, an Oklahoma limited liability company

SANCTUARY BELIZE PROPERTY OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, d/b/a The Reserve Property Owners' Association, a Texas non-profit corporation

PRODIGY MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company

NEWPORT LAND GROUP, LLC, a/k/a Laguna Palms, a/k/a Sanctuary Belize, a/k/a Bamboo Springs, a/k/a The Reserve, a Wyoming limited liability company

POWER HAUS MARKETING, a California corporation

ATLANTIC INTERNATIONAL BANK, LTD, a company organized under the laws of Belize

ANGELA CHITTENDEN

BRANDI GREENFIELD, individually and as an officer or owner of Global Property Alliance, Inc. (also doing business as Sanctuary Bay, Sanctuary Belize, The Reserve, Kanantik, Laguna Palms, Bamboo Springs, Eco Futures, Eco Futures Development, Eco Futur

ECO-FUTURES BELIZE LIMITED, d/b/a Sanctuary Bay, d/b/a Sanctuary Belize, d/b/a The Reserve, a California Corporation

SOUTHERN BLAZE REALTY, LLC, a limited liability company organized under the laws of Belize

Respondent

FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

Intervenors

JERRY BROWN

CLIFF SMITH

THE HAMPSHIRE GENERATIONAL FUND LLC

PENNY SCRUTCHIN

TERRI SMITH

PHILLIP WATFORD

THERESA EDELEN

JOHN A. SARACENO

Receiver

ROBB EVANS & ASSOCIATES, LLC

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Theodore (Jack) Metzler

Attorney at FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION

600 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20580-0000

Luke Chadwick

1828 Jamaica Road

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

7 #2

informal brief form

7 #1

Rule 45 notice

#6

(#6) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 5 ] Number of days granted: 7. Informal Opening Brief due 01/28/2020 Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Luke Chadwick. [1000656690] [19-2387] JHM [Entered: 01/07/2020 09:12 AM]

#5

(#5) MOTION by Luke Chadwick to extend filing time for informal opening brief until 21 days.. Date and method of service: 12/30/2019 US mail. [1000656370] [19-2387] JHM [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:15 PM]

4 #2

informal brief form

4 #1

Rule 45 notice

#2

(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Luke Chadwick. Informal Opening Brief due 12/30/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2387] JHM [Entered: 12/05/2019 02:57 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03309-PJM. Case manager: JMoore. [19-2387] JHM [Entered: 12/05/2019 01:22 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Luke Chadwick re: failure to file informal brief. Mailed to: Luke Chadwick. [19-2387] JHM [Entered: 01/31/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 5 ] Number of days granted: 7. Informal Opening Brief due 01/28/2020 Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Luke Chadwick. [1000656690] [19-2387] JHM [Entered: 01/07/2020 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Luke Chadwick to extend filing time for informal opening brief until 21 days.. Date and method of service: 12/30/2019 US mail. [1000656370] [19-2387] JHM [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Luke Chadwick re: failure to file informal brief. Mailed to: Luke Chadwick. [19-2387] JHM [Entered: 01/06/2020 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#3) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03309-PJM. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2387] JHM [Entered: 12/05/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Luke Chadwick. Informal Opening Brief due 12/30/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2387] JHM [Entered: 12/05/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03309-PJM. Case manager: JMoore. [19-2387] JHM [Entered: 12/05/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC INTERNATIONAL BANK, LTD, a company organized under the laws of Belize is a litigant