This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/03/2021 at 06:04:45 (UTC).

Federal Trade Commission v. John Usher

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Federal Trade Commission filed an Other lawsuit against John Usher. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1520

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendants

BG MARKETING, LLC, an Oklahoma limited liability company

SANCTUARY BELIZE PROPERTY OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, d/b/a The Reserve Property Owners' Association, a Texas non-profit corporation

PRODIGY MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company

NEWPORT LAND GROUP, LLC, a/k/a Laguna Palms, a/k/a Sanctuary Belize, a/k/a Bamboo Springs, a/k/a The Reserve, a Wyoming limited liability company

POWER HAUS MARKETING, a California corporation

ATLANTIC INTERNATIONAL BANK, LTD, a company organized under the laws of Belize

ANGELA CHITTENDEN

BRANDI GREENFIELD, individually and as an officer or owner of Global Property Alliance, Inc. (also doing business as Sanctuary Bay, Sanctuary Belize, The Reserve, Kanantik, Laguna Palms, Bamboo Springs, Eco Futures, Eco Futures Development, Eco Futur

ECO-FUTURES BELIZE LIMITED, d/b/a Sanctuary Bay, d/b/a Sanctuary Belize, d/b/a The Reserve, a California Corporation

SOUTHERN BLAZE REALTY, LLC, a limited liability company organized under the laws of Belize

Respondent

FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

Intervenors

JERRY BROWN

CLIFF SMITH

THE HAMPSHIRE GENERATIONAL FUND LLC

PENNY SCRUTCHIN

TERRI SMITH

PHILLIP WATFORD

THERESA EDELEN

JOHN A. SARACENO

Receiver

ROBB EVANS & ASSOCIATES, LLC

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Theodore (Jack) Metzler

Attorney at FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION

600 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 22030

John Usher

Neil Harris Koslowe

Attorney at POTOMAC LAW GROUP PLLC

1300 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#5

#4

#5

#6

#7

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/11/2021. Response Brief due 09/10/2021. [20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520, 21-1521, 21-1591, 21-1592] JSN [Entered: 07/02/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE re: District Court Decision on Motion for Release of Funds by Federal Trade Commission in 20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520, 21-1521, 21-1591, 21-1592. [20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520, 21-1521, 21-1591, 21-1592] Theodore (Jack) Metzler [Entered: 06/30/2021 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER filed suspending proceedings on appeal. Copies to all parties. [1000966423] [20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520, 21-1521, 21-1591, 21-1592] JSN [Entered: 06/09/2021 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEF by Peter Baker in 21-1454, Buy Belize, LLC, Buy International, Inc., Eco Futures Development, Eco-Futures Belize Limited and Foundation Development Management Inc. in 21-1591 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000965946] [20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520, 21-1521, 21-1591, 21-1592] Neil Koslowe [Entered: 06/08/2021 07:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Memorandum referencing appellate jurisdiction [ # 7 ] Order by Federal Trade Commission in 20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520, 21-1521, 21-1591, 21-1592. [1000963063] [20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520, 21-1521, 21-1591, 21-1592] Theodore (Jack) Metzler [Entered: 06/03/2021 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER filed consolidating case 21-1591, 21-1592 with 20-2215(L). Copies to all parties. [1000953841] [20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520, 21-1521, 21-1591, 21-1592] JSN [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docket(#8) ORDER filed consolidating case 21-1591,21-1592 with 20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520, 21-1521. Copies to all parties. [1000953791] [20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520, 21-1521, 21-1591, 21-1592] JSN [Entered: 05/18/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER filed granting Motion to consolidate case [ # 1000952393-2 ] in 20-2215, granting Motion to consolidate case [ # 1000952394-2 ] in 21-1454, granting Motion to consolidate case [ # 6 ] in 21-1520, granting Motion to consolidate case [ # 1000952397-2 ] in 21-1521; directing filing of memoranda on or before 06/08/2021. Copies to all parties. [1000953478] [20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520, 21-1521] JSN [Entered: 05/18/2021 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by John Usher to consolidate case 20-2215, 21-1454, 21-1520 with 21-1521. Date and method of service: 05/14/2021 ecf. [1000952396] [21-1520] Neil Koslowe [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Neil H Koslowe for John Usher. [1000951376] [21-1520] Neil Koslowe [Entered: 05/13/2021 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Theodore (Jack) Metzler for Federal Trade Commission. [1000947719] [21-1520] Theodore (Jack) Metzler [Entered: 05/06/2021 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 05/28/2021. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. Mailed to: John Usher. [21-1520] JSN [Entered: 05/04/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FEE NOTICE issued to John Usher - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 06/03/2021. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03309-PJM. Mailed to: John Usher. [21-1520] JSN [Entered: 05/04/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03309-PJM. Case manager: JeffNeal. [21-1520] JSN [Entered: 05/04/2021 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HAMPSHIRE GENERATIONAL FUND LLC is a litigant