This case was last updated from PACER on 05/12/2019 at 06:04:05 (UTC).

Federal Home Loan Mortg Corp v. Wilma Pennington-Thurman

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 Federal Home Loan Mortg Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wilma Pennington-Thurman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1509

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Defendant / Appellant

Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman

Saint Louis, MO 63177

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Charles Smathers Pullium III

Attorney at MILLSAP & SINGER

612 Spirit Drive

Chesterfield, MO 63005-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman

P.O. Box 771201

Saint Louis, MO 63177

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/10/2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4766235] [19-1509] (EDG) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:35 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Charles S. Pullium, III for Appellee Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation w/service 03/18/2019 [4767497] [19-1509] (CSP) [Entered: 03/18/2019 09:23 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Opinion, Memorandum and Order dated 02/14/2019 [4766213] [19-1509] (RLS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:05 PM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion to proceed IFP on Appeal

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: Motion to transfer filed by Appellant Ms. Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman in 19-1509 , [ # 4775244-2 ] is hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL [4782193] [19-1509] (EDG) [Entered: 04/29/2019 10:56 AM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Motion for Stay

Open Document

JUDGE ORDER: The motion for stay or injunction of State Court Proceedings is construed as a petition for writ of mandamus. The petition for writ of mandamus is denied [ # 4775231-2 ], motion filed by Appellant Ms. Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman. Adp Apr 2019 [4782186] [19-1509] (EDG) [Entered: 04/29/2019 10:48 AM]

Open Document #1

Motion for Transfer

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Restricted Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

ProSe Docketing Letter

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: Motion to transfer filed by Appellant Ms. Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman in 19-1509 , [ # 4775244-2 ] is hereby ordered taken with the case for consideration by the panel to which this case is submitted for disposition on the merits. - FOR CAL [4782193] [19-1509] (EDG) [Entered: 04/29/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGE ORDER: The motion for stay or injunction of State Court Proceedings is construed as a petition for writ of mandamus. The petition for writ of mandamus is denied [ # 4775231-2 ], motion filed by Appellant Ms. Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman. Adp Apr 2019 [4782186] [19-1509] (EDG) [Entered: 04/29/2019 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to transfer this case to the United States Court of Federal Claims Pursuant to 28 U.S. Code 1631., filed by Appellant Ms. Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman w/service 04/08/2019. [4775244] [19-1509] (EDG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for Stay or Injunction of State Court Proceedings, filed by Appellant, Ms. Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman w/service 04/08/2019. [4775231] [19-1509] (EDG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Ms. Wilma M. Pennington-Thurman w/service 04/02/2019. [4772949] [19-1509] (RLS) [Entered: 04/02/2019 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Charles S. Pullium, III for Appellee Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation w/service 03/18/2019 [4767497] [19-1509] (CSP) [Entered: 03/18/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/10/2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4766235] [19-1509] (EDG) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Opinion, Memorandum and Order dated 02/14/2019 [4766213] [19-1509] (RLS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4766205] [19-1509]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by EDG to issue corrected letter] (RLS) [Entered: 03/13/2019 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.