This case was last updated from PACER on 05/13/2019 at 06:21:48 (UTC).

FDIC v. Almeida-Leon, et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 FDIC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Almeida-Leon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1261

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JUAN ALMEIDA-LEON

WANDA CRUZ-QUILES

TENERIFE REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC

FRANCISCO ALMEIDA-LEON

Plaintiff / Appellant

FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, as Receiver for R-G Premier Bank of Puerto Rico

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Fernando E. Longo-Quinones

Attorney at Berrios & Longo, PSC

239 Arterial Hostos, Ste 900, Capital Center Bldg

San Juan, PR 00918-1478

Edilberto Berrios-Perez

Attorney at Berrios & Longo, PSC

239 Arterial Hostos, Ste 900, Capital Center Bldg

San Juan, PR 00918-1478

Roberto E. Berrios Falcon

239 Arterial Hostos Ave, Capital Center Bldg

San Juan, PR 00918

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

B. Amon James

Attorney at Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

3501 N Fairfax Dr, D-7064

Arlington, VA 22226

Jeffrey E. Schmitt

Attorney at Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

3501 N Fairfax Dr, D-7064

Arlington, VA 22226

Lynne Miriam Baum

Attorney at Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

3501 N Fairfax Dr, D-7064

Arlington, VA 22226

Jairo Alfonso Mellado-Villarreal

Attorney at Mellado & Mellado-Villarreal PSC

165 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 102

San Juan, PR 00926-0000

Tessie Marie Leal Garabis

Attorney at Mellado & Mellado-Villarreal

165 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 202

San Juan, PR 00917-1233

Hector Javier Orejuela-Davila

Attorney at Mellado & Mellado-Villarreal PSC

165 Ponce De Leon Ave, First Federal Bldg, Ste 102

Hato Rey, PR 00917

Mariana E. Bauza Almonte

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Minodora Daniela Vancea

Attorney at Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

3501 N Fairfax Dr, D-7064

Arlington, VA 22226

J. Scott Watson

Attorney at Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

3501 N Fairfax Dr, D-7064

Arlington, VA 22226

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated District Court Record

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FDIC filed by Attorney J. Scott Watson. Certificate of service dated 03/15/2019. [19-1261] (JSW) [Entered: 03/15/2019 05:17 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant FDIC. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1261] (JSW) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:57 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant FDIC indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1261] (JSW) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:01 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to expedite filed by Appellant FDIC. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1261] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JSW) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:19 PM]

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Notice of Appearance

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Francisco Almeida-Leon, Wanda Cruz-Quiles, Juan Almeida-Leon and Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC. Brief due 05/31/2019 for appellee Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon, Wanda Cruz-Quiles and Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC. [19-1261] (CP) [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:00 PM]

Open Document

JOINT MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon, Wanda Cruz-Quiles and Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC. Certificate of service dated 05/01/2019. [19-1261] (EB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:41 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Lynne Miriam Baum for FDIC, B. Amon James for FDIC and Jeffrey E. Schmitt for FDIC. [19-1261] (TS) [Entered: 04/17/2019 09:53 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant FDIC. Certificate of service dated 04/01/2019. [19-1261] (LIM) [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:27 PM]

Open Document #1

Appellant's Brief

Open Document #2

Appellee's Briefing Notice

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 04/15/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Lynne Miriam Baum for FDIC, B. Amon James for FDIC and Jeffrey E. Schmitt for FDIC. [19-1261] (CP) [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF tendered by Appellant FDIC. [19-1261] (MDV) [Entered: 04/01/2019 09:40 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FDIC filed by Attorney Minodora D. Vancea. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1261] (MDV) [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:18 AM]

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Francisco Almeida-Leon, Wanda Cruz-Quiles, Juan Almeida-Leon and Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC. Brief due 05/31/2019 for appellee Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon, Wanda Cruz-Quiles and Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC. [19-1261] (CP) [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon, Wanda Cruz-Quiles and Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC. Certificate of service dated 05/01/2019. [19-1261] (EB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Lynne Miriam Baum for FDIC, B. Amon James for FDIC and Jeffrey E. Schmitt for FDIC. [19-1261] (TS) [Entered: 04/17/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6244020-2 ] submitted by Appellant FDIC. [19-1261] (JMK) [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant FDIC. Certificate of service dated 04/01/2019. [19-1261] (LIM) [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant FDIC. Certificate of service dated 04/01/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 04/10/2019 . Brief due 05/01/2019 for APPELLEE Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon, Wanda Cruz-Quiles and Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC. [19-1261] (LIM) [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 04/15/2019, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Lynne Miriam Baum for FDIC, B. Amon James for FDIC and Jeffrey E. Schmitt for FDIC. [19-1261] (CP) [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF tendered by Appellant FDIC. [19-1261] (MDV) [Entered: 04/01/2019 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • APPENDIX filed by Appellant FDIC. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1261] (LIM) [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FDIC filed by Attorney Minodora D. Vancea. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1261] (MDV) [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 04/29/2019 for appellant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1261] (GB) [Entered: 03/20/2019 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge: "Appellant's Motion for Expedited Appeal" is DENIED . This appeal shall proceed in the ordinary course, and a standard briefing schedule will be entered in the ordinary course. [19-1261] (GB) [Entered: 03/20/2019 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE filed by Appellee Francisco Almeida-Leon, Wanda Cruz-Quiles and Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC to motion [ # 6240193-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2019. [19-1261] CLERK'S NOTE: Party selection was incomplete. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (REB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Tenerife Real Estate Holdings, LLC filed by Attorney Roberto E. Berrios-Falcon. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2019. [19-1261] (REB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Francisco Almeida-Leon, Juan Almeida-Leon and Wanda Cruz-Quiles filed by Attorney Edilberto Berrios-Perez. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2019. [19-1261] (EB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to expedite filed by Appellant FDIC. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1261] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JSW) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant FDIC indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1261] (JSW) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant FDIC. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1261] (JSW) [Entered: 03/18/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant FDIC filed by Attorney J. Scott Watson. Certificate of service dated 03/15/2019. [19-1261] (JSW) [Entered: 03/15/2019 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #48) filed by Appellant FDIC. Docketing Statement due 03/28/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 03/28/2019. Appearance form due 03/28/2019. [19-1261] (CP) [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.