This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/13/2021 at 06:11:44 (UTC).

Fastship LLC, et al v. Lockheed Martin Corp, et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Fastship LLC, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lockheed Martin Corp,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3529

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

FASTSHIP LLC

LIQUIDATING TRUST OF FASTSHIP INC

Defendant / Appellees

GIBBS & COX INC, Jointly, severally, and in the alternative

LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Raymond H. Lemisch Esq.

Christopher J. Leavell Esq.

Gregory M. Williams Esq.

Krystal B. Swendsboe Esq.

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Douglas Sharrott Esq.

Liza M. Walsh Esq.

Christopher M. Hemrick Esq.

William T. Walsh Esq. Jr.

Pasquale A. Razzano Esq.

Joshua Calabro Esq.

Rebecca M. Ricigliano Esq.

Carmen N. Longoria-Green Esq.

Dan Himmelfarb Esq.

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

25 #3

Standing Order Excess Pagination

25 #2

Hyperlinking Notice Manual Combo

25 #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

24 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

24 #1

Mediation Instructions

#23

#5

#4

#3

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Opinion

#1

Notice of Appeal

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Raymond H. Lemisch on behalf of Appellant(s) FastShip, LLC and Liquidating Trust of FastShip, Inc.. [20-3529] (RHL) [Entered: 02/09/2021 02:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Carmen Longoria-Green on behalf of Appellee(s) Lockheed Martin Corporation. [20-3529] (CNL) [Entered: 02/04/2021 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William T. Walsh, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Gibbs & Cox, Inc.. [20-3529] (WTW) [Entered: 01/27/2021 02:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc due on or before 03/08/2021. Appendix due on or before 03/08/2021. (JK) [Entered: 01/27/2021 01:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER (PHIPPS, Circuit Judge) denying motion to Expedite filed by Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc. Panel No.: DCO-027-E. PHIPPS, Authoring Judge. (JK) [Entered: 01/08/2021 11:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Krystal B. Swendsboe on behalf of Appellant(s) FastShip, LLC and the Liquidating Trust of FastShip, Inc.. [20-3529] (KBS) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ECF FILER: REPLY on behalf of Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc. in Support of the Motion to Expedite Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 01/04/2021 by ECF. [20-3529]--[Edited 01/04/2021 by JK] (RHL) [Entered: 01/04/2021 03:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Lockheed Martin Corp to motion to Expedite. Certificate of Service dated 12/30/2020. [20-3529] (DH) [Entered: 12/30/2020 09:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Liza M. Walsh on behalf of Appellee(s) Gibbs & Cox, Inc.. [20-3529] (LMW) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc. [20-3529] (GMW) [Entered: 12/23/2020 08:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc. [20-3529] (GMW) [Entered: 12/23/2020 08:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Fastship LLC. [20-3529] (GMW) [Entered: 12/23/2020 08:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gregory M. Williams on behalf of Appellant(s) FastShip LLC and The Liquidating Trust of FastShip, Inc.. [20-3529] (GMW) [Entered: 12/23/2020 08:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc to Expedite Consideration of the Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 12/23/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3529] (RHL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 04:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Lockheed Martin Corp. [20-3529] (DH) [Entered: 12/18/2020 01:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dan Himmelfarb on behalf of Appellee(s) Lockheed Martin Corporation. [20-3529] (DH) [Entered: 12/18/2020 01:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Christopher J. Leavell, Esq., Raymond H. Lemisch, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 12/30/2020. (AMR) [Entered: 12/15/2020 04:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 12/15/2020 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc in District Court No. 1-17-cv-02919. (AMR) [Entered: 12/15/2020 04:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less