20-3529
12/15/2020
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Other Contract
FASTSHIP LLC
LIQUIDATING TRUST OF FASTSHIP INC
GIBBS & COX INC, Jointly, severally, and in the alternative
LOCKHEED MARTIN CORP
Raymond H. Lemisch Esq.
Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg
1835 Market Street, Suite 1400
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Christopher J. Leavell Esq.
Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg
10000 Lincoln Drive East, Suite 201
Marlton, NJ 08053
Gregory M. Williams Esq.
Attorney at Wiley Rein
1776 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006
Krystal B. Swendsboe Esq.
Attorney at Wiley Rein
1776 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006
Douglas Sharrott Esq.
Attorney at Venable
1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 20Th Floor, Rockefeller Center
New York, NY 10020
Liza M. Walsh Esq.
Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly & Falanga
Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor
Newark, NJ 07102
Christopher M. Hemrick Esq.
Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly & Falanga
Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor
Newark, NJ 07102
William T. Walsh Esq. Jr.
Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly & Falanga
Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor
Newark, NJ 07102
Pasquale A. Razzano Esq.
Attorney at Venable
1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 20Th Floor, Rockefeller Center
New York, NY 10020
Joshua Calabro Esq.
Attorney at Venable
1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 20Th Floor, Rockefeller Center
New York, NY 10020
Rebecca M. Ricigliano Esq.
Attorney at Crowell & Moring
590 Madison Avenue, 20Th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Carmen N. Longoria-Green Esq.
Attorney at Mayer Brown
1999 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006
Dan Himmelfarb Esq.
Attorney at Mayer Brown
1999 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006
Standing Order Excess Pagination
Hyperlinking Notice Manual Combo
Briefing and Scheduling Order
Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone
Mediation Instructions
Case Opening Letter
Standing Order Excess Pagination
Case Caption
District Court Order
District Court Opinion
Notice of Appeal
Docket(#28) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Raymond H. Lemisch on behalf of Appellant(s) FastShip, LLC and Liquidating Trust of FastShip, Inc.. [20-3529] (RHL) [Entered: 02/09/2021 02:49 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#27) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Carmen Longoria-Green on behalf of Appellee(s) Lockheed Martin Corporation. [20-3529] (CNL) [Entered: 02/04/2021 03:35 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#26) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William T. Walsh, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Gibbs & Cox, Inc.. [20-3529] (WTW) [Entered: 01/27/2021 02:08 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#25) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc due on or before 03/08/2021. Appendix due on or before 03/08/2021. (JK) [Entered: 01/27/2021 01:06 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:58 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#23) ORDER (PHIPPS, Circuit Judge) denying motion to Expedite filed by Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc. Panel No.: DCO-027-E. PHIPPS, Authoring Judge. (JK) [Entered: 01/08/2021 11:20 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Krystal B. Swendsboe on behalf of Appellant(s) FastShip, LLC and the Liquidating Trust of FastShip, Inc.. [20-3529] (KBS) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:02 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) ECF FILER: REPLY on behalf of Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc. in Support of the Motion to Expedite Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 01/04/2021 by ECF. [20-3529]--[Edited 01/04/2021 by JK] (RHL) [Entered: 01/04/2021 03:27 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Lockheed Martin Corp to motion to Expedite. Certificate of Service dated 12/30/2020. [20-3529] (DH) [Entered: 12/30/2020 09:42 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#19) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Liza M. Walsh on behalf of Appellee(s) Gibbs & Cox, Inc.. [20-3529] (LMW) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:41 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc. [20-3529] (GMW) [Entered: 12/23/2020 08:05 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc. [20-3529] (GMW) [Entered: 12/23/2020 08:03 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Fastship LLC. [20-3529] (GMW) [Entered: 12/23/2020 08:02 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gregory M. Williams on behalf of Appellant(s) FastShip LLC and The Liquidating Trust of FastShip, Inc.. [20-3529] (GMW) [Entered: 12/23/2020 08:00 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc to Expedite Consideration of the Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 12/23/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3529] (RHL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 04:02 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Lockheed Martin Corp. [20-3529] (DH) [Entered: 12/18/2020 01:21 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dan Himmelfarb on behalf of Appellee(s) Lockheed Martin Corporation. [20-3529] (DH) [Entered: 12/18/2020 01:20 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Christopher J. Leavell, Esq., Raymond H. Lemisch, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 12/30/2020. (AMR) [Entered: 12/15/2020 04:37 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 12/15/2020 04:36 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Fastship LLC and Liquidating Trust of Fastship Inc in District Court No. 1-17-cv-02919. (AMR) [Entered: 12/15/2020 04:29 PM]
[-] Read Less