This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2019 at 06:06:14 (UTC).

Faro v. Iancu

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Faro filed an Other lawsuit against Iancu. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1476

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office

Petitioner / Appellant

JOHN H. FARO

Miami, FL 33131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Andrew Sun Han

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

John H. Faro

Attorney at Faro & Associates

1395 Brickell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION of Appellant John H. Faro to extend the time to 05/13/2019 to file the initial brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/21/2019 by email. [595226] [SMJ] [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:50 AM]

#9

(#9) ORDER filed. This appeal is reactivated. John H. Faro's informal brief is due no later than twenty one days from the date of filing of this order. If he chooses to file a formal brief, Mr. Faro's formal brief is due within 60 days from the filing date of this order. Service: 02/11/2019 by clerk. [584664] [LS] [Entered: 02/11/2019 09:30 AM]

#8

(#8) Corrected Entry of appearance for J0HN H. FARO, ESQ as principal counsel for Appellant John H. Faro. Service: 02/05/2019 by email. [583635] [19-1476] [John Faro] [Entered: 02/05/2019 06:53 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for JOHN H. FARO, ESQ as principal counsel for Appellant John H. Faro. Service: 02/05/2019 by email. [583630] [19-1476] [John Faro] [Entered: 02/05/2019 06:06 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant John H. Faro. Service: 02/05/2019 by email. [583627] [19-1476] [John Faro] [Entered: 02/05/2019 05:55 PM]

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant John H. Faro. Service: 02/05/2019 by email. [583624] [19-1476] [John Faro] [Entered: 02/05/2019 05:51 PM]

#4

(#4) Notice from Appellee Iancu regarding postjudgment motions. Service: 02/01/2019 by email, US mail. [582719] [19-1476] [Andrew Han] [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:32 AM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Andrew S. Han as principal counsel for Appellee Iancu. Service: 02/01/2019 by email, US mail. [582711] [19-1476] [Andrew Han] [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:27 AM]

#2

(#2) ORDER deactivating appeal. The parties are directed to notify this court upon entry of the order disposing of the last outstanding motion. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [581434] [MJL] [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:01 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file initial brief [ # 11 ] filed by Appellant John H. Faro. Brief is due 05/13/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [595227] [SMJ] [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION of Appellant John H. Faro to extend the time to 05/13/2019 to file the initial brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/21/2019 by email. [595226] [SMJ] [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Clerk's Note to the File: Appellant's formal brief due 04/12/2019. (Ref: clerk order, [ # 9 ]) [593555] [SMJ] [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER filed. This appeal is reactivated. John H. Faro's informal brief is due no later than twenty one days from the date of filing of this order. If he chooses to file a formal brief, Mr. Faro's formal brief is due within 60 days from the filing date of this order. Service: 02/11/2019 by clerk. [584664] [LS] [Entered: 02/11/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corrected Entry of appearance for J0HN H. FARO, ESQ as principal counsel for Appellant John H. Faro. Service: 02/05/2019 by email. [583635] [19-1476] [John Faro] [Entered: 02/05/2019 06:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for JOHN H. FARO, ESQ as principal counsel for Appellant John H. Faro. Service: 02/05/2019 by email. [583630] [19-1476] [John Faro] [Entered: 02/05/2019 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant John H. Faro. Service: 02/05/2019 by email. [583627] [19-1476] [John Faro] [Entered: 02/05/2019 05:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant John H. Faro. Service: 02/05/2019 by email. [583624] [19-1476] [John Faro] [Entered: 02/05/2019 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice from Appellee Iancu regarding postjudgment motions. Service: 02/01/2019 by email, US mail. [582719] [19-1476] [Andrew Han] [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Andrew S. Han as principal counsel for Appellee Iancu. Service: 02/01/2019 by email, US mail. [582711] [19-1476] [Andrew Han] [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER deactivating appeal. The parties are directed to notify this court upon entry of the order disposing of the last outstanding motion. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [581434] [MJL] [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/16/2019. [581429] Entry of Appearance due 02/11/2019. Appellant's informal brief due 02/19/2019. [MJL] [Entered: 01/28/2019 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.