This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2019 at 06:00:48 (UTC).

Farhan Warfaa v. Yusuf Ali

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Farhan Warfaa filed an Other lawsuit against Yusuf Ali. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1675

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

FARHAN MOHAMOUD TANI WARFAA

Defendant / Appellant

YUSUF ABDI ALI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Lindsay Robertson Barnes III

Attorney at DLA PIPER US LLP

500 8Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Richard Scott Kelley

Attorney at DLA PIPER US LLP

500 8Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Benjamin Daniel Klein

Attorney at DLA PIPER US LLP

500 8Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Carmen Ka Man Cheung

Attorney at CENTER FOR JUSTICE & ACCOUNTABILITY

1 Hallidie Plaza

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Joseph Peter Drennan

218 North Lee Street

Alexandria, VA 22314-0000

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER filed [1000568982] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 09/09/2019. Response brief due 10/08/2019 Copies to all parties. [19-1668, 19-1675] JHM [Entered: 08/19/2019 09:39 AM]

#14

(#12) MOTION by Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1668, 19-1675 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix.. Date and method of service: 08/18/2019 ecf. [1000568841] [19-1668, 19-1675] Joseph Drennan [Entered: 08/18/2019 11:56 PM]

#13

(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Benjamin D. Klein for Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000566111] [19-1668, 19-1675] Benjamin Klein [Entered: 08/13/2019 12:19 PM]

#12

(#10) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1675, 19-1668 re: filing of docketing statement Docketing statement due from Yusuf Abdi Ali on 08/01/2019.. [19-1675, 19-1668] JHM [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:00 AM]

#11

(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/19/2019. Response Brief due 09/17/2019 [19-1668, 19-1675] JHM [Entered: 07/09/2019 01:14 PM]

#9

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1668, 19-1675. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000543251] [19-1668, 19-1675] Joseph Drennan [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:39 PM]

#8

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph Peter Drennan for Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000543250] [19-1668, 19-1675] Joseph Drennan [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:37 PM]

#7

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Carmen K. Cheung for Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000543229] [19-1668, 19-1675] Carmen Cheung [Entered: 07/08/2019 08:40 PM]

#6

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000543227] [19-1668, 19-1675] Lindsay Barnes [Entered: 07/08/2019 07:49 PM]

#5

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lindsay R. Barnes III for Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000543225] [19-1668, 19-1675] Lindsay Barnes [Entered: 07/08/2019 07:48 PM]

#3

(#3) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:05-cv-00701-LMB-JFA.. [19-1675] JHM [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:26 AM]

#2

(#2) ORDER filed [1000535373] consolidating case 19-1675 with 19-1668. Copies to all parties. [19-1668, 19-1675] JHM [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:22 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:05-cv-00701-LMB-JFA. Case manager: JMoore. [19-1675] JHM [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:15 AM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER filed [1000568982] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 09/09/2019. Response brief due 10/08/2019 Copies to all parties. [19-1668, 19-1675] JHM [Entered: 08/19/2019 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION by Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1668, 19-1675 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix.. Date and method of service: 08/18/2019 ecf. [1000568841] [19-1668, 19-1675] Joseph Drennan [Entered: 08/18/2019 11:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Benjamin D. Klein for Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000566111] [19-1668, 19-1675] Benjamin Klein [Entered: 08/13/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1675, 19-1668 re: filing of docketing statement Docketing statement due from Yusuf Abdi Ali on 08/01/2019.. [19-1675, 19-1668] JHM [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/19/2019. Response Brief due 09/17/2019 [19-1668, 19-1675] JHM [Entered: 07/09/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1668, 19-1675. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000543251] [19-1668, 19-1675] Joseph Drennan [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph Peter Drennan for Yusuf Abdi Ali in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000543250] [19-1668, 19-1675] Joseph Drennan [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Carmen K. Cheung for Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000543229] [19-1668, 19-1675] Carmen Cheung [Entered: 07/08/2019 08:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000543227] [19-1668, 19-1675] Lindsay Barnes [Entered: 07/08/2019 07:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lindsay R. Barnes III for Farhan Mohamoud Tani Warfaa in 19-1668, 19-1675. [1000543225] [19-1668, 19-1675] Lindsay Barnes [Entered: 07/08/2019 07:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:05-cv-00701-LMB-JFA.. [19-1675] JHM [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER filed [1000535373] consolidating case 19-1675 with 19-1668. Copies to all parties. [19-1668, 19-1675] JHM [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:05-cv-00701-LMB-JFA. Case manager: JMoore. [19-1675] JHM [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less