This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/17/2020 at 06:06:23 (UTC).

Faith Lindsey v. Luke Gatlin, et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Faith Lindsey filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Luke Gatlin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2955

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Vonda Duncan, Central Bank Assistance Vice President/Bookkeeping Supervisor

Robert Steele, Police Officer

Luke Gatlin, Detective

Hon. Jon A. Kaltenbronn, Administrative County Judge

Genise Buechter, Circuit Clerk of the Miller County Court

John R. Porth, Central Bank Senior Vice President

Robert Holtmeyer, Assistant Prosecuting Attorney

James W. Mead, Central Bank Senior VP & Chairman

Central Bank of Lake of the Ozarks

Kathy M. Herx, Central Bank Senior Vice President

Mark Beauchamp, Corporal, Police Officer

County Court of Miller County

Brian Kidwell, Chief of Police

Jenna Lawson, Clerk of the Court of Miller County

Ben Winfrey, Prosecuting DA

Richard Caine, Eldon Central Bank Manager

Linda Lawson, Miller County Court

James Judas, Central Bank CEO and President

Jack Funderburk, Central Bank Senior Vice President

Plaintiff / Appellant

Faith Lindsey

Reidsville, NC 27320

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew A. Clement

Attorney at COOK & VETTER

231 Madison Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101-0000

John Terry Brooks

Attorney at NEWMAN & COMLEY

P.O. Box 537

Jefferson City, MO 65102-0537

Michael G. Berry

Attorney at NEWMAN & COMLEY

P.O. Box 537

Jefferson City, MO 65102-0537

Peter A. Houser

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

207 W. High Street, P.O. Box 899

Jefferson City, MO 65102-0000

Matthew William Vineyard

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

207 W. High Street, P.O. Box 899

Jefferson City, MO 65102-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Faith Lindsey

1915 Ashley Loop Road

Reidsville, NC 27320

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Appellant's CORRECTED Addendum

Open Restricted Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Restricted Document #2

Addendum of appellant

Open Restricted Document #1

Brief of appellant

Open Document

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #2

envelope

Open Document #1

Response to case opening letter re: Untimely filing of NOA

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document #1

Cover Letter

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Ms. Faith Lindsey , w/service by USCA8 11/16/2020 [4976094] [20-2955] (AMT) [Entered: 11/16/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Faith Lindsey w/service 11/13/2020. Length: 6,644 words. Copies: 5. Brief(s) of Mark Beauchamp, Genise Buechter, Richard Caine, Central Bank of Lake of the Ozarks, Vonda Duncan, Jack Funderburk, Luke Gatlin, Kathy M. Herx, Robert Holtmeyer, James Judas, Jon A. Kaltenbronn, Brian Kidwell, Jenna Lawson, James W. Mead, Miller County, John R. Porth, Robert Steele and Ben Winfrey due on 12/14/2020. [4975259] [20-2955] THE ADDENDUM ATTACHED TO THE BRIEF HAS BEEN REPLACED BY THE CORRECTED ADDENDUM FILED ON 11/16/2020. (BNW) [Entered: 11/13/2020 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Faith Lindsey due 12/08/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4971094] [20-2955] (AEV) [Entered: 10/29/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE in opposition to case opening letter regarding untimely filing of notice of appeal [ # 4957505-2 ] filed by Ms. Faith Lindsey (Appellant provided the certified mail receipt for the mailing and the tracking number indicates it was received in St. Louis on 9/14/20 at 9:30 am), w/service 10/29/2020. [4971045] [20-2955] (AEV) [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: On the court's own motion, appellant is granted an extension of time to address the issue of untimeliness in the U.S. District Court until 10/30/2020. [4965724] [4965724] [20-2955] (AEV) [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by John T. Brooks for Appellees Luke Gatlin, Robert Steele, Brian Kidwell, Mark Beauchamp, Miller County, Miller County, Ben Winfrey, Robert Holtmeyer and Jenna Lawson w/service 09/22/2020 [4958063] [20-2955] (JTB) [Entered: 09/22/2020 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 8/13/20, Judgment 8/13/20, docket entries, [4957505] [20-2955] (AEV) [Entered: 09/18/2020 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4957502] [20-2955] (AEV) [Entered: 09/18/2020 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less