This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:38 (UTC).

Fader Reichard v. Henderson Covington Messenger, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Fader Reichard filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Henderson Covington Messenger. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12715

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

HENDERSON COVINGTON MESSENGER NEWMAN & THOMAS CO., L.P.A., an Ohio Legal Professional Coropation

DAVID K HOLMQUIST

Plaintiff / Appellant

FADER THOMPSON REICHARD, individually and as Beneficiary of the Amended and Restated James E. Reichard Trust u/a/d August 12, 2009, as amended

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Steven A. Colsky

Attorney at Kaplan Zeena, LLP

2 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3050

Miami, FL 33131

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Edward Royce Curtis

Attorney at Tripp Scott, PA

110 Se 6Th St Fl 15

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Jeffrey Scott Fauer

Attorney at Tripp Scott, PA

110 Se 6Th St Fl 15

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Open Document #4

USDC Judgment- Doc #20

Open Document

MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Fader Thompson Reichard. Motion is Unopposed. [8873416-1] [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 09/06/2019 04:41 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Edward Royce Curtis for Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:07 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Steven A. Colsky for Henderson Covington Messenger Newman & Thomas Co., L.P.A. and David K Holmquist. [19-12715] (ECF: Steven Colsky) [Entered: 07/26/2019 10:33 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Edward Royce Curtis for Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:19 PM]

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 07/12/2019 as to Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:20 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward Royce Curtis for Fader Thompson Reichard. [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:05 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:12 PM]

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Edward Royce Curtis for Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:10 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Steven A. Colsky for Appellees Henderson Covington Messenger Newman & Thomas Co., L.P.A. and David K Holmquist. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12715] (ECF: Steven Colsky) [Entered: 08/09/2019 01:49 PM]

Open Document

Corrected Motion [ # 8873416-2 ] filed by Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:24 PM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #19

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8873416-2 ] [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Corrected Motion [ # 8873416-2 ] filed by Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Fader Thompson Reichard. Motion is Unopposed. [8873416-1] [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 09/06/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Edward Royce Curtis for Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. Appellants brief due on 09/09/2019 as to Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. Appendix due on 09/16/2019 as to Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. [Entered: 08/23/2019 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Steven A. Colsky for Appellees Henderson Covington Messenger Newman & Thomas Co., L.P.A. and David K Holmquist. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12715] (ECF: Steven Colsky) [Entered: 08/09/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Edward Royce Curtis for Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Edward Royce Curtis for Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Edward Royce Curtis for Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward Royce Curtis for Fader Thompson Reichard. [19-12715] (ECF: Edward Curtis) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Edward Royce Curtis for Fader Thompson Reichard and Jeffrey Scott Fauer for Fader Thompson Reichard. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Steven A. Colsky for Henderson Covington Messenger Newman & Thomas Co., L.P.A. and David K Holmquist. [19-12715] (ECF: Steven Colsky) [Entered: 07/26/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 07/12/2019 as to Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard on 07/12/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/26/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/29/2019 as to Appellant Fader Thompson Reichard. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/12/2019 as to Appellee Henderson Covington Messenger Newman & Thomas Co., L.P.A. [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.