This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 06:25:46 (UTC).

Ezell v. Yates, et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Ezell filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Yates. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7065

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

R. HODGSON, Captain, James Crabtree Correctional Center

JASON BRYANT, Warden, Joseph Harp Correctional Center

LT. AUSTIN PARKS, Lt., James Crabtree Correctional Center

JAMES NALL, Captain, James Crabtree Correctional Center

SERGEANT WALKER, Correctional Officer, James Crabtree Correctional Center

DAMON HININGER, CEO of Core Civic

Plaintiff / Appellant

JAMES RICKY EZELL, III

Holdenville, OK 74848-9033

Defendant / Appellees

SCOTT CROW, Interim Director, Oklahoma Department of Corrections

TIFFANY ADE, Echo Maximum Unit Manager, Davis Correctional Facility

TERRY UNDERWOOD, Grievance Coordinator, Davis Correctional Facility

DAVID A. CINCOTTA, General Counsel, Oklahoma Department of Corrections

(FNU) PEREZ, Deputy Warden, Davis Correctional Facility

S. PFAFF

MARK KNUTSON, Designee, Oklahoma Department of Corrections

CARLA HOOVER, AKA Carl Hoover

DEPUTY WARDEN GENTRY, Deputy Warden

JAMES YATES, Warden, Davis Correctional Facility

JESSICA PATTERSON, Law Library Supervisor, Davis Correctional Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

James Ricky Ezell III

Attorney at Holdenville DCF

6888 East 133Rd Road

Holdenville, OK 74848-9033

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Desiree Singer

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma

313 Ne 21St Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Darrell L. Moore

Attorney at J. Ralph Moore PC

P.O. Box 368

Pryor, OK 74362-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Order Cover Letter

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10707499] Supplement to Appellant's 12/27/19 response to show cause order. Original only. Served on 01/02/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7065] --[Edited 01/06/2020 by DJD to modify text and change ECF event] [Entered: 01/06/2020 02:04 PM]

Open Document

[10705689] Order filed by Clerk of the Court taking under advisement the "Plaintiff Memorandum Report Demonstrating for This Court Basis to Exercise Jurisdiction" filed by Appellant. Briefing on the merits remains suspended pending further order of this court. Served on 12/27/2019. [19-7065] [Entered: 12/27/2019 02:17 PM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10705629] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. James Ricky Ezell, III. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/19/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-7065] [Entered: 12/27/2019 12:26 PM]

Open Document

[10705581] Order filed by Clerk of the Court taking under advisement Appellant's Petition for Interlocutory Appeal [ # 10701023-2 ] pending the resolution of the 12/04/19 show cause order. Appellant's deadline to respond to the show cause order is extended to 1/06/20. Failure to file a timely response may result in dismissal of this appeal. Served on 12/27/2019. [19-7065] [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:08 AM]

Open Document

[10702967] Entry of appearance filed by Desiree Singer for Scott Crow, Mark Knutson and David A. Cincotta. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email [19-7065] [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:01 PM]

Open Document

[10702889] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Darrell L. Moore for (fnu) Perez, Mr. James Yates, Ms. Carla Hoover, Doctor Terry Underwood, Gentry, Tiffany Ade, Jessica Patterson and S. Pfaff. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7065] [Entered: 12/16/2019 02:35 PM]

Open Document

[10701403] Miscellaneous correspondence re mailing of petition to this court on 11/15/19 received from James Ricky Ezell, III but not filed. Original only. Dated 12/03/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7065] [Entered: 12/11/2019 07:26 AM]

Open Document

[10701023] Petition for Interlocutory Appeal filed by James Ricky Ezell, III. Original only. Postmarked 12/03/19. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7065] --[Edited 12/27/2019 by DJD to note document was filed] [Entered: 12/10/2019 07:07 AM]

Open Document

[10700036] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing Appellant to file a memorandum demonstrating any basis in law for this court's exercise of appellate jurisdiction over the district court's 11/14/19 order. Alternatively, Appellant may elect to do nothing and the appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response due by 12/26/2019 for James Ricky Ezell III. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Served on 12/04/2019. [19-7065] [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:01 PM]

Open Document #3

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #2

Transmittal letter

Open Document #1

Preliminary Record

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10707785] Jurisdictional Defect. (LLS) Procedural termination after other judicial action. Written, unsigned, unpublished Judges Lucero, Hartz and McHugh. [19-7065] [Entered: 01/07/2020 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10707499] Supplement to Appellant's 12/27/19 response to show cause order. Original only. Served on 01/02/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7065] --[Edited 01/06/2020 by DJD to modify text and change ECF event] [Entered: 01/06/2020 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10705689] Order filed by Clerk of the Court taking under advisement the "Plaintiff Memorandum Report Demonstrating for This Court Basis to Exercise Jurisdiction" filed by Appellant. Briefing on the merits remains suspended pending further order of this court. Served on 12/27/2019. [19-7065] [Entered: 12/27/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10705640] Response filed by James Ricky Ezell, III to [ # 10700036-2 ], show cause order. Served on 12/19/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7065] [Entered: 12/27/2019 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10705629] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. James Ricky Ezell, III. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/19/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-7065] [Entered: 12/27/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10705581] Order filed by Clerk of the Court taking under advisement Appellant's Petition for Interlocutory Appeal [ # 10701023-2 ] pending the resolution of the 12/04/19 show cause order. Appellant's deadline to respond to the show cause order is extended to 1/06/20. Failure to file a timely response may result in dismissal of this appeal. Served on 12/27/2019. [19-7065] [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702967] Entry of appearance filed by Desiree Singer for Scott Crow, Mark Knutson and David A. Cincotta. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email [19-7065] [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702951] Entry of appearance submitted by Desiree D. Singer for Appellees Scott Crow, David A. Cincotta and Mark Knutson for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-7065] --[Edited 12/16/2019 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 12/16/19] DS [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702889] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Darrell L. Moore for (fnu) Perez, Mr. James Yates, Ms. Carla Hoover, Doctor Terry Underwood, Gentry, Tiffany Ade, Jessica Patterson and S. Pfaff. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7065] [Entered: 12/16/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702856] Entry of appearance submitted by Darrell L. Moore for Appellees Tiffany Ade, Mr. James Yates, Gentry, Doctor Terry Underwood, (fnu) Perez, Jessica Patterson and S. Pfaff for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7065]--[Edited 12/16/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DLM [Entered: 12/16/2019 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10701403] Miscellaneous correspondence re mailing of petition to this court on 11/15/19 received from James Ricky Ezell, III but not filed. Original only. Dated 12/03/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7065] [Entered: 12/11/2019 07:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10701023] Petition for Interlocutory Appeal filed by James Ricky Ezell, III. Original only. Postmarked 12/03/19. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7065] --[Edited 12/27/2019 by DJD to note document was filed] [Entered: 12/10/2019 07:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10700036] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing Appellant to file a memorandum demonstrating any basis in law for this court's exercise of appellate jurisdiction over the district court's 11/14/19 order. Alternatively, Appellant may elect to do nothing and the appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response due by 12/26/2019 for James Ricky Ezell III. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Served on 12/04/2019. [19-7065] [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10699154] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/02/2019. Notice of appearance due on 12/16/2019 for Tiffany Ade, David A. Cincotta, Scott Crow, Deputy Warden Gentry, Carla Hoover, Mark Knutson, Jessica Patterson, Deputy Warden Perez, S. Pfaff, Terry Underwood and James Yates, and Notice of appearance due on 01/02/2020 for James Ricky Ezell III. Fee or 1915 forms due 01/02/2020 for James Ricky Ezell III [19-7065] [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.