This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/12/2020 at 06:06:35 (UTC).

Ezeani Ifesinachi v. Warden Essex County Correction

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Ezeani Ifesinachi filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Warden Essex County Correction. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2421

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

EZEANI GREGORY IFESINACHI

Maplewood, NJ 07040

Defendant / Appellee

WARDEN ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ezeani Gregory Ifesinachi

80 Van Nes Terrace

Maplewood, NJ 07040

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Enes Hajdarpasic Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Sarah S. Wilson Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

1801 4Th Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

District Court Order

1 #3

District Court Memorandum

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #5

Standing Order

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Additional Document in Support of Appeal in response to clerk order on behalf of Appellant Ezeani Gregory Ifesinachi Certificate of Service dated 08/28/2020. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Document in Support of Appeal in response to clerk order on behalf of Appellant Ezeani Gregory Ifesinachi. Certificate of Service dated 08/25/2020. Service made by US mail.--[Edited 09/04/2020 by SB] (SB) [Entered: 09/04/2020 02:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah Wilson on behalf of Appellee(s) Warden, Essex County Correctional Facility. [20-2421] (SSW) [Entered: 08/17/2020 02:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Ezeani Gregory Ifesinachi The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order. (SB) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Enes Hajdarpasic, Esq. for Warden Essex County Correctional Facility requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/19/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 08/05/2020 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION filed by Appellant Ezeani Gregory Ifesinachi to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 07/18/2020. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 08/06/2020 03:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 07/14/2020 10:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ezeani Gregory Ifesinachi in District Court No. 2-19-cv-19287. (SB) [Entered: 07/14/2020 09:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Stevens Wilson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENES HAJDARPASIC