This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/15/2019 at 06:07:13 (UTC).

Exmark Manufacturing Company v. Briggs & Stratton Corp.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 Exmark Manufacturing Company filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Briggs Stratton Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1878

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

EXMARK MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC.

Defendant / Appellant

BRIGGS & STRATTON CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Alexander Rinn

Attorney at Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh & Lindquist, P.A.

225 South Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Joseph W. Winkels

Attorney at Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh & Lindquist, P.A.

225 South Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

J. Derek Vandenburgh

Attorney at Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh & Lindquist PA

225 South 6Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Marc A. Cohn

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Matthew Wolf

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • (#13) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [617379] [JAL] [Entered: 06/27/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 3 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 4 ], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 10 ], ERROR: The law firm information on the entries of appearance for J. Winkels [ # 3 ], A. Rinn [ # 4 ], and M. Cohn [ # 10 ] does not match the information in the attorneys' user accounts. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure that all information matches. [610662] [JAL] [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Briggs & Stratton Corp. indicating that a request is made to the reporter for a transcript. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610539] [19-1878] [Marc Cohn] [Entered: 05/30/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Entry of appearance for Marc A. Cohn as of counsel for Appellant Briggs & Stratton Corp.. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610538] [19-1878] [Marc Cohn] [Entered: 05/30/2019 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Briggs & Stratton Corp.. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610537] [19-1878] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 05/30/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Briggs & Stratton Corp.. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610536] [19-1878] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 05/30/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Matthew M. Wolf as principal counsel for Appellant Briggs & Stratton Corp.. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610535] [19-1878] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 05/30/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Exmark Manufacturing Company Inc.. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610479] [19-1878] [J. Derek Vandenburgh] [Entered: 05/30/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Exmark Manufacturing Company Inc.. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610478] [19-1878] [J. Derek Vandenburgh] [Entered: 05/30/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Alexander S. Rinn as of counsel for Appellee Exmark Manufacturing Company Inc.. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610477] [19-1878] [Alexander Rinn] [Entered: 05/30/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Joseph W. Winkels as of counsel for Appellee Exmark Manufacturing Company Inc.. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610474] [19-1878] [Joseph Winkels] [Entered: 05/30/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for J. Derek Vandenburgh as principal counsel for Appellee Exmark Manufacturing Company Inc.. Service: 05/30/2019 by email. [610473] [19-1878] [J. Derek Vandenburgh] [Entered: 05/30/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/15/2019. [607874] Entry of Appearance is due 05/30/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/30/2019. Docketing Statement is due 05/30/2019. Appellant's brief is due 07/15/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Exmark Manufacturing Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BRIGGS & STRATTON CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc A. Cohn