This case was last updated from PACER on 06/29/2019 at 06:11:31 (UTC).

Exelon Generation Company, LLC v. Benjamin Grumbles, et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Exelon Generation Company, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Benjamin Grumbles. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7037

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

D. Lee Currey, Director, Water and Science Administration, Maryland Department of the Environment, State of Maryland, in his official capacity

Benjamin H Grumbles, Secretary of the Environment, State of Maryland, in his official capacity

Petitioner / Appellant

Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellee

Exelon Generation Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Peter J. Hopkins Esquire

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Scott Harris Strauss

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Jon Alan Mueller

Attorney at Chesapeake Bay Foundation

6 Herndon Avenue

Annapolis, MD 21403

Paul W. Smail

Attorney at Chesapeake Bay Foundation

6 Herndon Avenue

Annapolis, MD 21403

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew E. Price

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

David William DeBruin

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791192] filed by D. Lee Currey and Benjamin H Grumbles [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [19-7037] (Strauss, Scott) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:40 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791188] filed by Scott H. Strauss and co-counsel Peter J. Hopkins on behalf of Appellees Benjamin H Grumbles and D. Lee Currey. [19-7037] (Strauss, Scott) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:37 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT [1790996] with Disclosure Listing filed by Exelon Generation Company, LLC [Service Date: 06/04/2019 ] [19-7037] (DeBruin, David) [Entered: 06/04/2019 06:06 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1790981] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 06/04/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7037] (Smail, Paul) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:53 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1790780] filed by Exelon Generation Company, LLC [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7037] (DeBruin, David) [Entered: 06/03/2019 06:28 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790779] filed by David W. DeBruin on behalf of Appellee Exelon Generation Company, LLC. [19-7037] (DeBruin, David) [Entered: 06/03/2019 06:02 PM]

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1790714] submitted by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7037] (Smail, Paul) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:31 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1790710] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-7037] (Smail, Paul) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:26 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1790701] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7037] (Smail, Paul) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:20 PM]

Open Document #2

Rule 26.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement

Open Document #1

Certificate as to Parties, Rulings and Related Cases Filed

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1787648] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 05/13/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-7037] (Mueller, Jon) [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:53 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1785991] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/17/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/03/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/03/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/03/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/17/2019 [19-7037] [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:37 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1785468] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01224-RMC filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7037. [19-7037] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:57 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1794405] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 08/05/2019, APPENDIX due 08/05/2019, APPELLEE Brief due on 09/04/2019, APPELLANT Reply Brief due 09/25/2019. [19-7037] [Entered: 06/25/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791192] filed by D. Lee Currey and Benjamin H Grumbles [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [19-7037] (Strauss, Scott) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791188] filed by Scott H. Strauss and co-counsel Peter J. Hopkins on behalf of Appellees Benjamin H Grumbles and D. Lee Currey. [19-7037] (Strauss, Scott) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT [1790996] with Disclosure Listing filed by Exelon Generation Company, LLC [Service Date: 06/04/2019 ] [19-7037] (DeBruin, David) [Entered: 06/04/2019 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1790981] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 06/04/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7037] (Smail, Paul) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1790780] filed by Exelon Generation Company, LLC [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7037] (DeBruin, David) [Entered: 06/03/2019 06:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790779] filed by David W. DeBruin on behalf of Appellee Exelon Generation Company, LLC. [19-7037] (DeBruin, David) [Entered: 06/03/2019 06:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1790714] submitted by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7037] (Smail, Paul) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1790710] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-7037] (Smail, Paul) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1790701] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7037] (Smail, Paul) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1790697] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7037] (Smail, Paul) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1790686] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7037] (Smail, Paul) [Entered: 06/03/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790678] filed by Paul W. Smail and co-counsel Jon A. Mueller on behalf of Appellant Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc.. [19-7037] (Smail, Paul) [Entered: 06/03/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1787648] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. [Service Date: 05/13/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-7037] (Mueller, Jon) [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1785991] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/03/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/17/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/03/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/03/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/03/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/17/2019 [19-7037] [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1785468] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01224-RMC filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7037. [19-7037] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7037] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less