This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/12/2022 at 06:01:18 (UTC).

Evrett James, et al v. Westin St. John Hotel Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 Evrett James filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Westin St John Hotel Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-12327

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

EVRETT JAMES

Kissimmee, FL 34746

VERONICA ELLERBE

Kissimmee, FL 34746

Defendant / Appellee

WESTIN ST. JOHN HOTEL COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Evrett James

3883 Carrick Bend Dr

Kissimmee, FL 34746

Veronica Ellerbe

3883 Carrick Bend Dr

Kissimmee, FL 34746

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joyce Ackerbaum Cox

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Nailah Donnaye Bowen

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Erin Sales

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Erin Michelle Sales

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellants Veronica Ellerbe and Evrett James. [Entered: 08/30/2022 03:25 PM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Veronica Ellerbe and Evrett James. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/04/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/26/2022 02:18 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 08/25/2022 as to Appellants Veronica Ellerbe and Evrett James. [Entered: 08/26/2022 09:56 AM]

Open Document #2

CIpP pg 2

Open Document #1

Certificate of Interested Persons

Open Restricted Document #6

Motion to Proceed IFP cont5

Open Restricted Document #5

Motion to Proceed IFP cont.4

Open Restricted Document #4

Motion to Proceed IFP Cont3

Open Restricted Document #3

Motion to Proceed IFP cont.

Open Restricted Document #2

certicate of interested persons CIP

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion to Proceed IFP

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nailah Bowen for Westin St. John Hotel Company, Inc. [22-12327] (ECF: Nailah Bowen) [Entered: 07/29/2022 04:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Erin Sales for Westin St. John Hotel Company, Inc.. [22-12327] (ECF: Erin Sales) [Entered: 07/28/2022 04:05 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joyce Ackerbaum Cox for Westin St. John Hotel Company, Inc.. [22-12327] (ECF: Joyce Cox) [Entered: 07/22/2022 02:16 PM]

Open Document #4

Order DE# 56

Open Document #3

Judgment DE# 58

Open Document #2

NOA DE# 61

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellants Veronica Ellerbe and Evrett James. [Entered: 08/30/2022 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellants Veronica Ellerbe and Evrett James. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/04/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/26/2022 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo action will be taken on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 9727915-2 ]. The referenced filing by Appellant Veronica Ellerbe. *Filing Fee paid. [Entered: 08/26/2022 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 08/25/2022 as to Appellants Veronica Ellerbe and Evrett James. [Entered: 08/26/2022 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party Evrett James. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12327] (ECF: Evrett James) [Entered: 08/25/2022 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo action will be taken on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 9744783-2 ]. The referenced filing by Appellant Evrett James is deficient for failure to comply with this court's rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements. [Entered: 08/24/2022 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Evrett James. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9744783-1] [22-12327] (ECF: Evrett James) [Entered: 08/24/2022 07:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of deficient to Evrett James. Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed through another person's ECF account. A filing made through a persons electronic-filing account and authorized by that person, together with that persons name on a signature block, constitutes the persons signature. * Party must file motion through one's own account. [Entered: 08/23/2022 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of deficient to Evrett James. MOTION to proceed IFP filed through another person's ECF account. A filing made through a persons electronic-filing account and authorized by that person, together with that persons name on a signature block, constitutes the persons signature. * Party must file motion through one's own account. [Entered: 08/23/2022 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo action will be taken on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 9742237-2 ]., Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 9742231-2 ]., Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 9727972-2 ]. The referenced filing by Appellants Veronica Ellerbe and Evrett James is deficient for failure to comply with this court's rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements. [Entered: 08/23/2022 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThis APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 08/10/2022 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Evrett James, Appellant. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12327] (ECF: Veronica Ellerbe) [Entered: 08/05/2022 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party Veronica Ellerbe. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12327] (ECF: Veronica Ellerbe) [Entered: 08/05/2022 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Veronica Ellerbe and Evrett James. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 08/02/2022 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Veronica Ellerbe. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9727972-1] [22-12327] (ECF: Veronica Ellerbe) [Entered: 08/01/2022 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Veronica Ellerbe. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9727915-1] [22-12327] (ECF: Veronica Ellerbe) [Entered: 08/01/2022 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nailah Bowen for Westin St. John Hotel Company, Inc. [22-12327] (ECF: Nailah Bowen) [Entered: 07/29/2022 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Erin Sales for Westin St. John Hotel Company, Inc.. [22-12327] (ECF: Erin Sales) [Entered: 07/28/2022 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joyce Ackerbaum Cox for Westin St. John Hotel Company, Inc.. [22-12327] (ECF: Joyce Cox) [Entered: 07/22/2022 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Veronica Ellerbe and Evrett James on 07/14/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/01/2022 as to Appellants Veronica Ellerbe and Evrett James. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/15/2022 as to Appellee Westin St. John Hotel Company, Inc. [Entered: 07/18/2022 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Westin St. John Hotel Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nailah Donnaye Bowen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Michelle Sales

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joyce Ackerbaum Cox