This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2020 at 05:00:49 (UTC).

Evariste v. Barr

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 Evariste filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2293

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EMMANUEL EVARISTE

North Dartmouth, MA 02747-0000

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Emmanuel Evariste

Attorney at Bristol County Jail

400 Faunce Corner Road

North Dartmouth, MA 02747-0000

Respondent Attorneys

Derek C. Julius

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

OIL OIL

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

450 5Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Anthony Paul Nicastro

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document

ORDER entered: Petitioner has filed a motion to stay removal. This order is issued in accordance with First Circuit Local Rule 18.0. Removal of the petitioner is hereby stayed for ten business days from the date of this order. The government shall file its response to the motion in accordance with the Local Rule. [19-2293] (GRC) [Entered: 12/30/2019 05:23 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #1

Petition

Open Restricted Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Respondent William P. Barr filed by Attorney Regina Byrd. Certificate of service dated 12/31/2019. [19-2293] (RB) [Entered: 12/31/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered: Petitioner has filed a motion to stay removal. This order is issued in accordance with First Circuit Local Rule 18.0. Removal of the petitioner is hereby stayed for ten business days from the date of this order. The government shall file its response to the motion in accordance with the Local Rule. [19-2293] (GRC) [Entered: 12/30/2019 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE regarding application of Local Rule 18.0. [19-2293] (GRC) [Entered: 12/30/2019 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EMERGENCY MOTION to stay removal filed by Petitioner Emmanuel Evariste. [19-2293] (GRC) [Entered: 12/30/2019 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AGENCY CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Emmanuel Evariste. Administrative record due 02/10/2020. Fee due 01/13/2020. Copy of petition served on respondent(s) pursuant to FRAP 15(c). [19-2293] (GRC) [Entered: 12/30/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.