This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/18/2022 at 06:01:36 (UTC).

Evan Cuff v. American Tire Distributors Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Evan Cuff filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against American Tire Distributors Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3153

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

EVAN CUFF

Defendant / Appellees

AMERICAN TIRE DISTRIBUTORS INC, DBA American Tire Distributors

KEVIN SOTAK, Individually

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Seth D. Carson Esq.

Attorney at Derek Smith Law Group

1835 Market Street, Suite 2950

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Laura C. Bunting Esq.

Attorney at Jackson Lewis

1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Marla N. Presley Esq.

Attorney at Jackson Lewis

1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

13 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

13 #1

Mediation Instructions

#12

(#12) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Seth D. Carson, Esq. for Evan Cuff requesting the following document(s): Transcript Purchase Order on or before 01/26/2022. (CJG) [Entered: 01/12/2022 11:17 AM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: AMENDED Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Evan Cuff. [21-3153] (SDC) [Entered: 12/22/2021 04:53 PM]

10 #3

Attachment #2

10 #2

Attachment

10 #1

Concise Summary of the Case

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Evan Cuff. [21-3153] (SDC) [Entered: 12/21/2021 11:03 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Seth Carson on behalf of Appellant(s) Evan Cuff. [21-3153] (SDC) [Entered: 12/21/2021 10:59 PM]

#7

(#7) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Seth D. Carson, Esq. for Evan Cuff requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form, Information Statement, Concise Summary and Transcript Purchase Order on or before 12/21/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 12/07/2021 10:46 AM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Laura C. Bunting on behalf of Appellee(s) American Tire Distributors, Inc., American Tire Distributors Inc. d/b/a American Tire Distributors, Kevin Sotak. [21-3153] (LCB) [Entered: 12/03/2021 09:08 AM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee American Tire Distributors Inc. [21-3153] (MNP) [Entered: 12/03/2021 09:06 AM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Marla N. Presley on behalf of Appellee(s) American Tire Distributors, Inc., American Tire Distributors Inc. d/b/a American Tire Distributors, Kevin Sotak. [21-3153] (MNP) [Entered: 12/03/2021 09:03 AM]

#3

(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Seth D. Carson, Esq. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 12/06/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 11/19/2021 10:31 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #3

District Court Opinion 10/19/21

1 #2

District Court Judgment 10/19/21

#1

Civil Case Docketed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 01/12/2022 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Seth D. Carson, Esq. for Evan Cuff requesting the following document(s): Transcript Purchase Order on or before 01/26/2022. (CJG) [Entered: 01/12/2022 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: AMENDED Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Evan Cuff. [21-3153] (SDC) [Entered: 12/22/2021 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Evan Cuff. [21-3153] (SDC) [Entered: 12/21/2021 11:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Evan Cuff. [21-3153] (SDC) [Entered: 12/21/2021 11:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Seth Carson on behalf of Appellant(s) Evan Cuff. [21-3153] (SDC) [Entered: 12/21/2021 10:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Seth D. Carson, Esq. for Evan Cuff requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form, Information Statement, Concise Summary and Transcript Purchase Order on or before 12/21/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 12/07/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Laura C. Bunting on behalf of Appellee(s) American Tire Distributors, Inc., American Tire Distributors Inc. d/b/a American Tire Distributors, Kevin Sotak. [21-3153] (LCB) [Entered: 12/03/2021 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee American Tire Distributors Inc. [21-3153] (MNP) [Entered: 12/03/2021 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Marla N. Presley on behalf of Appellee(s) American Tire Distributors, Inc., American Tire Distributors Inc. d/b/a American Tire Distributors, Kevin Sotak. [21-3153] (MNP) [Entered: 12/03/2021 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Seth D. Carson, Esq. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 12/06/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 11/19/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 11/19/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Evan Cuff in District Court No. 2-20-cv-00784. (CJG) [Entered: 11/19/2021 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN TIRE DISTRIBUTORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura C. Bunting Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marla N. Presley