This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2020 at 06:01:32 (UTC).

Eugene Scalia v. Evolve Bank & Trust

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 Eugene Scalia filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Evolve Bank Trust. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1251

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Defendants

SENTRY EQUIPMENT ERECTORS, INC. EMPLOYEE STOCK OWNERSHIP AND SAVINGS PLAN

MICHAEL NEW

ADAM VINOSKEY

SENTRY EQUIPMENT ERECTORS, INC.

ADAM VINOSKEY TRUST

Defendant / Appellant

EVOLVE BANK & TRUST

Plaintiff / Appellee

EUGENE SCALIA, Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Lee Junk

Attorney at GROOM LAW GROUP, CHARTERED

1701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-5811

Kristen J. Kenley

Attorney at MOORE & VAN ALLEN, PLLC

100 North Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28202-4003

Mary Cabell Clay

Attorney at MOORE & VAN ALLEN, PLLC

100 North Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28202-4003

Mark A. Nebrig

Attorney at MOORE & VAN ALLEN, PLLC

100 North Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28202-4003

Lars Calvin Golumbic

Attorney at GROOM LAW GROUP, CHARTERED

1701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-5811

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Chelsea Mikula Tomko

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Brian Adam Wright

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Scott J. Stitt

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

175 South 3Rd Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Alexandra Brisky Cunningham

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Harry D. Cornett

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Thomas R. Waskom

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Mitchell Kirks Morris

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

919 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Scott King Field

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

1400 Lavaca Street

Austin, TX 78701

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ryan Matthew Kooi

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

170 South Independence Mall West

Philadelphia, PA 19106-0000

Andrea Christensen Luby

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

170 South Independence Mall West

Philadelphia, PA 19106-0000

Jeffrey Michael Hahn

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

200 Constitution Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20210-0000

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time and to continue mediation with the Circuit Mediator [ # 14 ]. Number of days granted: 85. Opening brief and appendix due 07/22/2020. Response brief due 08/21/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000724072] [20-1251, 20-1252] CB [Entered: 04/20/2020 09:27 AM]

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION by Evolve Bank & Trust in 20-1251 to extend filing time for Filing Briefs until July 22, 2020. , to Continue Mediation.. Date and method of service: 04/17/2020 ecf. [1000723544] [20-1251, 20-1252] Scott Field [Entered: 04/17/2020 01:58 PM]

#13

(#13) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [20-1251, 20-1252] LHP [Entered: 04/08/2020 12:13 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER filed granting Motion to file separate briefs [ # 11 ]; denying Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 11 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000715895] [20-1251, 20-1252] CB [Entered: 04/06/2020 03:47 PM]

#11

(#11) Amended MOTION by Adam Vinoskey Trust and Adam Vinoskey in 20-1252 to file separate briefs [11] , to exceed length limitations for brief. Date and method of service: 04/03/2020 ecf. [1000714737] [20-1251, 20-1252] Lars Golumbic [Entered: 04/03/2020 11:50 AM]

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey M. Hahn for Mr. Eugene Scalia in 20-1251, 20-1252. [1000705787] [20-1251, 20-1252] Jeffrey Hahn [Entered: 03/19/2020 04:52 PM]

#8

(#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Ryan Kooi and Andrea Luby. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/28/2020. Response Brief due 05/28/2020. [20-1251, 20-1252] CB [Entered: 03/19/2020 08:28 AM]

#7

(#7) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1252 with 20-1251. Copies to all parties. [1000705055] [20-1251, 20-1252] CB [Entered: 03/19/2020 08:03 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mitchell Morris for Evolve Bank & Trust. [1000704570] [20-1251] Mitchell Morris [Entered: 03/18/2020 11:50 AM]

5 #2

Additional Document

5 #1

Docketing statement (civil/agency)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evolve Bank & Trust. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000704552] [20-1251] Scott Field [Entered: 03/18/2020 11:39 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott K. Field for Evolve Bank & Trust. [1000704544] [20-1251] Scott Field [Entered: 03/18/2020 11:36 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 6:16-cv-00062-NKM-RSB. Mailed to: Harry Cornett, Alexandra Cunningham, Ryan Kooi, Andrea Luby, Scott Stitt and Chelsea Tomko. [20-1251] CB [Entered: 03/04/2020 02:12 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:16-cv-00062-NKM-RSB. Case manager: CBennett. [20-1251] CB [Entered: 03/04/2020 12:10 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time and to continue mediation with the Circuit Mediator [ # 14 ]. Number of days granted: 85. Opening brief and appendix due 07/22/2020. Response brief due 08/21/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000724072] [20-1251, 20-1252] CB [Entered: 04/20/2020 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint MOTION by Evolve Bank & Trust in 20-1251 to extend filing time for Filing Briefs until July 22, 2020. , to Continue Mediation.. Date and method of service: 04/17/2020 ecf. [1000723544] [20-1251, 20-1252] Scott Field [Entered: 04/17/2020 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [20-1251, 20-1252] LHP [Entered: 04/08/2020 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER filed granting Motion to file separate briefs [ # 11 ]; denying Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 11 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000715895] [20-1251, 20-1252] CB [Entered: 04/06/2020 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Amended MOTION by Adam Vinoskey Trust and Adam Vinoskey in 20-1252 to file separate briefs [11] , to exceed length limitations for brief. Date and method of service: 04/03/2020 ecf. [1000714737] [20-1251, 20-1252] Lars Golumbic [Entered: 04/03/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Adam Vinoskey Trust and Adam Vinoskey in 20-1252 to file separate briefs [10] , to exceed length limitations for brief, to appoint/assign counsel. Date and method of service: 04/03/2020 ecf. [1000714616] [20-1251, 20-1252]--[Edited 04/03/2020 by CB - see ECF 11 for amended motion.] Lars Golumbic [Entered: 04/03/2020 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey M. Hahn for Mr. Eugene Scalia in 20-1251, 20-1252. [1000705787] [20-1251, 20-1252] Jeffrey Hahn [Entered: 03/19/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Ryan Kooi and Andrea Luby. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/28/2020. Response Brief due 05/28/2020. [20-1251, 20-1252] CB [Entered: 03/19/2020 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1252 with 20-1251. Copies to all parties. [1000705055] [20-1251, 20-1252] CB [Entered: 03/19/2020 08:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mitchell Morris for Evolve Bank & Trust. [1000704570] [20-1251] Mitchell Morris [Entered: 03/18/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Evolve Bank & Trust. [20-1251] Scott Field [Entered: 03/18/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evolve Bank & Trust. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000704552] [20-1251] Scott Field [Entered: 03/18/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott K. Field for Evolve Bank & Trust. [1000704544] [20-1251] Scott Field [Entered: 03/18/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 6:16-cv-00062-NKM-RSB. Mailed to: Harry Cornett, Alexandra Cunningham, Ryan Kooi, Andrea Luby, Scott Stitt and Chelsea Tomko. [20-1251] CB [Entered: 03/04/2020 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:16-cv-00062-NKM-RSB. Case manager: CBennett. [20-1251] CB [Entered: 03/04/2020 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor is a litigant

Latest cases where EVOLVE BANK AND TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lars C. Golumbic