This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/31/2021 at 06:02:12 (UTC).

Eugene Mazo, et al v. New Jersey Secty State, et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Eugene Mazo filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against New Jersey Secty State. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2630

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

EUGENE MAZO

LISA MCCORMACK

Defendant / Appellees

SECRETARY NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF STATE

E. JUNIOR MALDANADO, in his official capacity as Hudson County Clerk

JOANNE RAJOPPI, in her official capacity as Union County Clerk

PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO, in her official capacity as Mercer County Clerk

ELAINE FLYNN, in her official capacity as Middlesex County Clerk

CHRISTOPHER J. DURKIN, in his official capacity as Essex County Clerk

STEVE PETER, in his official capacity as Somerset County Clerk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Walter M. Luers Esq.

Attorney at Cohn Lifland Pearlman Herrmann & Knopf

Park 80 West - Plaza One, 250 Pehle Avenue, Suite 401

Saddle Brook, NJ 07663

Ryan Morrison Esq.

Attorney at Institute for Free Speech

1150 Connecticut Avenue, N.W., Suite 801

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nicole E. Adams Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Hughes Justice Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Dominic L. Giova Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Hughes Justice Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Michael L. Dermody Esq.

Attorney at Office of County Counsel

567 Pavonia Avenue

Jersey City, NJ 07306

Moshood Muftau Esq.

Attorney at County of Union

10 Elizabethtown Plaza

Elizabeth, NJ 07207

Paul R. Adezio Esq.

Attorney at Office of County Counsel

640 South Broad Street, P.O. Box 8068

Trenton, NJ 08650

Michael S. Williams Esq.

Attorney at Office of Middlesex County Counsel

75 Bayard Street, Middlesex County Administration Building, Room 230

New Brunswick, NJ 08901

Alan Ruddy Esq.

Attorney at Office of County Counsel

465 Martin Luther King Boulevard, Hall Of Records, Room 535

Newark, NJ 07102

Anthony P. Seijas Esq.

Attorney at Cleary Giacobbe Alfieri & Jacobs

169 Ramapo Valley Road, Upper Level 105

Oakland, NJ 07436

Jessica V. Henry Esq.

Attorney at Cleary Giacobbe Alfieri & Jacobs

169 Ramapo Valley Road, Upper Level 105

Oakland, NJ 07436

 

Court Documents

18 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

18 #1

Standing Order

#17

(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from MICHAEL L. DERMODY on behalf of Appellee(s) E. Junior Maldanado. [21-2630] (MLD) [Entered: 10/19/2021 04:05 PM]

#16

(#16) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael L. Dermody, Esq. for E. Junior Maldanado requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/26/2021. (ARR) [Entered: 10/12/2021 01:22 PM]

#15

(#15) NONCOMPLIANCE ORDER sent to Appellee E. Junior Maldanado advising no action will be taken on Entry of Appearance filed by Daniel J. DeSalvo, Esq. insofar as Mr. De Salvo is not a member of the Third Circuit Bar. Compliance due 10/06/2021. (ARR) [Entered: 09/29/2021 03:05 PM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan Ruddy, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Christopher Durkin. [21-2630] (AR) [Entered: 09/10/2021 01:48 PM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Moshood Muftau, Esq First Deputy County Counsel on behalf of Appellee(s) Union County Clerk, Joanne Rajoppi. [21-2630] (MM) [Entered: 09/10/2021 01:33 PM]

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

DC_Order_073021

1 #2

DC_Opinion_073021

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • Docket(#19) Appellants verbally granted an extension of time to file brief & appendix until 12/14/2021. pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. (SB) [Entered: 10/28/2021 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Eugene Mazo and Lisa McCormack due on or before 11/30/2021. Appendix due on or before 11/30/2021. (ARR) [Entered: 10/21/2021 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from MICHAEL L. DERMODY on behalf of Appellee(s) E. Junior Maldanado. [21-2630] (MLD) [Entered: 10/19/2021 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael L. Dermody, Esq. for E. Junior Maldanado requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/26/2021. (ARR) [Entered: 10/12/2021 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NONCOMPLIANCE ORDER sent to Appellee E. Junior Maldanado advising no action will be taken on Entry of Appearance filed by Daniel J. DeSalvo, Esq. insofar as Mr. De Salvo is not a member of the Third Circuit Bar. Compliance due 10/06/2021. (ARR) [Entered: 09/29/2021 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel J. DeSalvo on behalf of Appellee(s) Hudson County Clerk, E. Junior Maldonado.- [DOCUMENT REMOVED INSOFAR AS COUNSEL LISTED IS NOT ADMITTED TO THE THIRD CIRCUIT BAR. NONCOMPLIANCE ORDER SENT 09/29/2021 ADVISING A NEW ENTRY OF APPEARANCE MUST BE FILED ONCE COUNSEL BECOMES ADMITTED.] [21-2630]--[Edited 09/29/2021 by ARR] (MLD) [Entered: 09/29/2021 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan Ruddy, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Christopher Durkin. [21-2630] (AR) [Entered: 09/10/2021 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Moshood Muftau, Esq First Deputy County Counsel on behalf of Appellee(s) Union County Clerk, Joanne Rajoppi. [21-2630] (MM) [Entered: 09/10/2021 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael S. Williams, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) ELAINE FLYNN, in her official capacity as Middlesex County Clerk. [21-2630] (MSW) [Entered: 09/02/2021 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nicole E. Adams on behalf of Appellee(s) Secretary, New Jersey Department of State. [21-2630] (NEA) [Entered: 09/02/2021 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jessica V. Henry, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Steve Peter in his official capacity as Somerset County Clerk. [21-2630] (JVH) [Entered: 09/02/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Paul R. Adezio, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Mercer County (NI) Clerk Paula Sollami Covello. [21-2630] (PRA) [Entered: 09/02/2021 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Eugene Mazo and Lisa McCormack advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [21-2630] (RM) [Entered: 09/02/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Eugene Mazo and Lisa McCormack. [21-2630] (RM) [Entered: 09/02/2021 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Eugene Mazo and Lisa McCormack. [21-2630] (RM) [Entered: 09/02/2021 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Eugene Mazo and Lisa McCormack. [21-2630] (RM) [Entered: 09/02/2021 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ryan Morrison on behalf of Appellant(s) Eugene Mazo and Lisa McCormick. [21-2630] (RM) [Entered: 09/02/2021 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (ARR) [Entered: 09/01/2021 10:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Eugene Mazo and Lisa McCormack in District Court No. 3-20-cv-08174. (ARR) [Entered: 09/01/2021 10:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICOLE ELIZABETH ADAMS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL L. DERMODY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY P. SEIJAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moshood Muftau Esq.