This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/24/2020 at 06:15:06 (UTC).

Eugene Hudson, Jr. v. American Federation of Govern, et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Eugene Hudson, Jr filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against American Federation of Govern,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5181

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

American Federation of Government Employees

United States Department of Labor

Anita Autrey, individually, and in her official capacity as Local 1923 President

Local 1923 American Federation of Government Employees

Plaintiff / Appellant

Eugene Hudson, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gony Frieder Goldberg

R. Craig Lawrence

Alan Burch

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Marlene D. Morten

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document #2

Westlaw Version

Open Document #1

Supplemental Document Filed

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Motion Filed

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1856841] to motion for summary reversal [ # 1855725-2 ], motion for reconsideration [ # 1855725-3 ] filed by American Federation of Government Employees and Local 1923 American Federation of Government Employees [Service Date: 08/17/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 725. [20-5181] (Goldberg, Gony) [Entered: 08/17/2020 02:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENT [1856833] to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1855832-2 ] filed by American Federation of Government Employees and Local 1923 American Federation of Government Employees [Service Date: 08/17/2020 ] [20-5181] (Goldberg, Gony) [Entered: 08/17/2020 02:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM ORDER [1856580] filed denying motion for reconsideration of the court's order filed July 31, 2020 [ # 1855725-3 ]. FURTHER ORDERED that the motions for summary disposition will be considered in the normal course. FURTHER ORDERED that, within ten days of the date of this order, appellant file a reply to the Department of Labor's response [ # 1854115-2 ] to the second amended motion to dismiss appellees. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Before Judges: Henderson, Tatel and Katsas. [20-5181] [Entered: 08/14/2020 12:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1856069] to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1855832-2 ] filed by Eugene Hudson, Jr. [Service Date: 08/11/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1348. [20-5181] (Morten, Marlene) [Entered: 08/11/2020 02:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY SUPPLEMENT [1856024] to motion for summary reversal [ # 1855725-2 ] filed by Eugene Hudson, Jr. [Service Date: 08/11/2020 ] [20-5181] (Morten, Marlene) [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1856021] to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1855832-2 ] filed by Eugene Hudson, Jr. [Service Date: 08/11/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1349. [20-5181] (Morten, Marlene) [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENT [1855931] to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1855832-2 ] filed by American Federation of Government Employees and Local 1923 American Federation of Government Employees [Service Date: 08/10/2020 ] [20-5181] (Goldberg, Gony) [Entered: 08/10/2020 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1855832] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/20/2020) filed by American Federation of Government Employees and Local 1923 American Federation of Government Employees (Service Date: 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2,452 countable words. [20-5181] (Goldberg, Gony) [Entered: 08/10/2020 01:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION [1855725] reconsideration of order [ # 1854595-2 ], for summary reversal (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/17/2020) filed by Eugene Hudson, Jr. (Service Date: 08/07/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 4,733. [20-5181]--[Edited 08/13/2020 by AY] (Morten, Marlene) [Entered: 08/07/2020 06:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES, ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, STATEMENT OF ISSUES and STATEMENT OF INTENT TO UTILIZE DEFERRED JOINT APPENDIX [1855038] filed by Eugene Hudson, Jr. [Service Date: 08/04/2020 ] [20-5181]--[Edited 08/05/2020 by AY--MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT] (Morten, Marlene) [Entered: 08/04/2020 04:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1853638] filed by Eugene Hudson, Jr. [Service Date: 07/27/2020 ] [20-5181] (Morten, Marlene) [Entered: 07/27/2020 02:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1852813] filed by American Federation of Government Employees and Local 1923 American Federation of Government Employees [Service Date: 07/21/2020 ] [20-5181] (Goldberg, Gony) [Entered: 07/21/2020 05:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1852812] filed by Gony Goldberg and co-counsel Rushab Sanghvi on behalf of Appellees American Federation of Government Employees and Local 1923 American Federation of Government Employees. [20-5181] (Goldberg, Gony) [Entered: 07/21/2020 05:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1852800] filed by DOL [Service Date: 07/21/2020 ] [20-5181] (Burch, Alan) [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1852798] filed by Alan Burch and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee DOL. [20-5181] (Burch, Alan) [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1850970] filed by DOL [Service Date: 07/09/2020 ] [20-5181] (Burch, Alan) [Entered: 07/09/2020 07:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1850969] filed by Alan Burch and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee DOL. [20-5181] (Burch, Alan) [Entered: 07/09/2020 07:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1848952] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/27/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/27/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/27/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/27/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/27/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/27/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/27/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/27/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/10/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/27/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/27/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/27/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/10/2020 [20-5181] [Entered: 06/25/2020 02:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1848951] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02738-JEB filed by Eugene Hudson, Jr.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5181. [20-5181] [Entered: 06/25/2020 02:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5181] [Entered: 06/25/2020 02:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less