This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/04/2021 at 05:21:13 (UTC).

Ethicon LLC v. ITC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Ethicon LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ITC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1111

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

ETHICON LLC

Appellee

INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION

Washington, DC 20436

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Anish R. Desai

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Appellee Attorney

Assistant General Counsel, International Trade Commission

Attorney at International Trade Commission

500 E Street, Sw

Washington, DC 20436

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 10/20/2021. [809725] Entry of Appearance due 11/16/2021. Certificate of Interest due on 11/16/2021. Docketing Statement due 12/02/2021. Certified List due 12/13/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 11/02/2021 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant