This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/11/2022 at 06:07:06 (UTC).

E.T. v. Paxton

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 E T filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Paxton. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-51083

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

E.T., by and through her parents and next friends

J.A., as parent and next friend of D.D.

E.R., by and through her parents and next friends

J.R., by and through her parents and next friends

R.M., as parent and next friend of H.M.

D.D., by and through her parents and next friends

M.M., as parent and next friend of E.S.

C.M., as parent and next friend of A.M.

B.M., as parent and next friend of A.M.

G.R., as parent and next friend of E.R.

S.M., as parent and next friend of H.M.

S.C., as parent and next friend of N.C.

R.G., as parent and next friend of J.G.

C.G., as parent and next friend of J.G.

K.P., as parent and next friend of M.P.

J.P., as parent and next friend of M.P.

K.P., as parent and next friend of H.P.

D.P., as parent and next friend of H.P.

S.P., by and through her parents and next friends

M.P., by and through her parents and next friends

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Linda T. Coberly

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

35 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

William G. Fox

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

2121 N. Pearl Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Thomas M. Melsheimer

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

2121 N. Pearl Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Scott Cashion Thomas Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

2121 N. Pearl Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael Woodrum

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

2121 N. Pearl Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Brandon W. Duke

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

800 Capitol Street

Houston, TX 77002-2925

Brian D. East

Attorney at Disability Rights Texas

2222 W. Braker Lane

Austin, TX 78758

John Michael Gaddis Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

2121 N. Pearl Street

Dallas, TX 75201

L. Kym Davis Rogers

Attorney at Disability Rights Texas

1420 W. Mockingbird Lane

Dallas, TX 75247-0000

Other Attorneys

Ryan Glen Kercher

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 12548 (Mc-019), Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Judd Edward Stone II

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

209 W. 14Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Eric J. Hamilton

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

P.O. Box 12548 (Mc 059)

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Appellee Brief filed by Appellees E.T., J.R., S.P., M.P., E.S., H.M. and A.M. in 21-51083 [ # 9751013-2 ]. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/14/2022 for Appellees A.M., E.S., E.T., H.M., J.R., M.P. and S.P.. [21-51083] (MVM) [Entered: 01/10/2022 07:39 AM]

Open Document

PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Paxton in 21-51083 [ # 9742142-2 ], Appellant Brief filed by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Paxton in 21-51083 [ # 9742141-2 ]. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/14/2022 for Appellant Kenneth Paxton.. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 01/14/2022 for Appellant Kenneth Paxton. [21-51083] (MVM) [Entered: 01/10/2022 07:28 AM]

Open Document

APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied [21-51083] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by A.M., E.S., E.T., H.M., J.R., M.P. and S.P.. Date of service: 01/07/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Coberly, Duke, East, Fox, Gaddis, Melsheimer, Rogers, Thomas, Woodrum; Attorney for Appellants: Hamilton, Kercher, Stone [21-51083] (Linda T. Coberly ) [Entered: 01/07/2022 06:36 PM]

Open Document

RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. [21-51083] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Paxton. Date of service: 12/24/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Coberly, Duke, East, Fox, Gaddis, Melsheimer, Rogers, Thomas, Woodrum; Attorney for Appellants: Hamilton, Kercher, Stone [21-51083] (Judd Edward Stone II) [Entered: 12/24/2021 12:57 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied [21-51083] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Kenneth Paxton. Date of service: 12/24/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Coberly, Duke, East, Fox, Gaddis, Melsheimer, Rogers, Thomas, Woodrum; Attorney for Appellants: Hamilton, Kercher, Stone [21-51083] (Judd Edward Stone II) [Entered: 12/24/2021 12:54 PM]

Open Document

CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 01/31/2022. [21-51083] (GAM) [Entered: 12/10/2021 04:26 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-51083] (Michael Woodrum ) [Entered: 12/07/2021 11:30 AM]

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #1

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #1

Non Dispositive Court Order

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Appellee Brief filed by Appellees E.T., J.R., S.P., M.P., E.S., H.M. and A.M. in 21-51083 [ # 9751013-2 ]. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/14/2022 for Appellees A.M., E.S., E.T., H.M., J.R., M.P. and S.P.. [21-51083] (MVM) [Entered: 01/10/2022 07:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Paxton in 21-51083 [ # 9742142-2 ], Appellant Brief filed by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Paxton in 21-51083 [ # 9742141-2 ]. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/14/2022 for Appellant Kenneth Paxton.. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 01/14/2022 for Appellant Kenneth Paxton. [21-51083] (MVM) [Entered: 01/10/2022 07:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied [21-51083] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by A.M., E.S., E.T., H.M., J.R., M.P. and S.P.. Date of service: 01/07/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Coberly, Duke, East, Fox, Gaddis, Melsheimer, Rogers, Thomas, Woodrum; Attorney for Appellants: Hamilton, Kercher, Stone [21-51083] (Linda T. Coberly ) [Entered: 01/07/2022 06:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD EXCERPTS FILED. [21-51083] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Paxton. Date of service: 12/24/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Coberly, Duke, East, Fox, Gaddis, Melsheimer, Rogers, Thomas, Woodrum; Attorney for Appellants: Hamilton, Kercher, Stone [21-51083] (Judd Edward Stone II) [Entered: 12/24/2021 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied [21-51083] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Kenneth Paxton. Date of service: 12/24/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Coberly, Duke, East, Fox, Gaddis, Melsheimer, Rogers, Thomas, Woodrum; Attorney for Appellants: Hamilton, Kercher, Stone [21-51083] (Judd Edward Stone II) [Entered: 12/24/2021 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Wednesday, 02/02/2022 in New Orleans in the En Banc Courtroom -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [21-51083] (SME) [Entered: 12/20/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 01/31/2022. [21-51083] (GAM) [Entered: 12/10/2021 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael Woodrum for party(s) Appellee E.S. Appellee H.M. Appellee J.R. Appellee A.M. Appellee S.P. Appellee E.T. Appellee M.P., in case 21-51083 [21-51083] (MVM) [Entered: 12/08/2021 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-51083] (Michael Woodrum ) [Entered: 12/07/2021 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-51083] (DDL) [Entered: 12/06/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 9719183-2 ] filed by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Paxton Date of Service: 11/23/2021 [21-51083] (MVM) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Paxton for stay pending appeal [9719183-2] Ruling is requested by: 11/26/2021, and for a temporary administriative stay while the Court considers this motion for stay pending appeal [9719183-3]. Date of service: 11/23/2021 [21-51083] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Paxton for stay pending appeal [9719183-2] Ruling is requested by: 11/26/2021. Date of service: 11/23/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Duke, East, Gaddis, Rogers; Attorney for Appellants: Hamilton, Kercher, Stone [21-51083] (Judd Edward Stone II) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Judd Edward Stone II for party(s) Appellant Kenneth Paxton, in case 21-51083 [21-51083] (MVM) [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Eric J. Hamilton for party(s) Appellant Kenneth Paxton, in case 21-51083 [21-51083] (MVM) [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-51083] (Eric J. Hamilton ) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-51083] (Judd Edward Stone II) [Entered: 11/22/2021 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Involvement terminated for Appellee K.P. in 21-51083. Reason: K.P. is not a party to this case. [21-51083] (LLL) [Entered: 11/18/2021 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Involvement terminated for Appellees J.A., E.R., R.M., D.D., M.M., C.M., B.M., G.R., S.M., S.C., R.G., C.G., K.P., J.P., D.P., A.S., Y.V., J.G., H.P., N.C., R.S. and J.V. in 21-51083. [21-51083] (LLL) [Entered: 11/18/2021 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9711317-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 11/30/2021 for Appellant Kenneth Paxton [21-51083] (MVM) [Entered: 11/15/2021 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Paxton [21-51083] (LLL) [Entered: 11/12/2021 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G.R. is a litigant

Latest cases where K.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where D.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where J.A. is a litigant