This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2021 at 06:08:06 (UTC).

Estate of Evaristo Acosta, et al v. WDW Joint Venture

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Estate of Evaristo Acosta filed an Other lawsuit against WDW Joint Venture. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55893

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

ESTATE OF EVARISTO ACOSTA, by and through its Successors-in-Interest Marcos Acosta and Elisa Acosta

MARCOS ACOSTA

ELISA ACOSTA

Defendant / Appellant

WDW JOINT VENTURE, DBA Downey Community Health Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Scott Carr

Attorney at Greene Broillet & Wheeler, LLP

222 N Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 2100

El Segundo, CA 90245

Stuart Bruce Esner

Attorney at Esner, Chang & Boyer

234 East Colorado Boulevard, Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Aaron L. Osten

Attorney at Greene Broillet and Wheeler, LLP

222 N Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 2100

El Segundo, CA 90245

Ivan Puchalt

Attorney at Greene Broillet and Wheeler, LLP

222 N Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 2100

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Lann G. McIntyre Esquire

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Rita R. Kanno

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

701 B Street, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12234280] (VS) [Entered: 09/21/2021 09:32 AM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/14/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12214928] (VS) [Entered: 08/30/2021 10:52 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant WDW Joint Venture Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/27/2021. [12213559] [21-55893] (McIntyre, Lann) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:50 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12234280] (VS) [Entered: 09/21/2021 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/14/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12214928] (VS) [Entered: 08/30/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney Stuart Bruce Esner for Appellees Estate of Evaristo Acosta, Elisa Acosta and Marcos Acosta, in case 21-55893. [12214210] (HH) [Entered: 08/27/2021 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stuart B. Esner (Esner, Chang & Boyer) for Appellees Estate of Evaristo Acosta, Marcos Acosta and Elisa Acosta. Date of service: 08/27/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12214127] [21-55893] (Esner, Stuart) [Entered: 08/27/2021 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/27/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12213667]. [21-55893] (AD) [Entered: 08/27/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant WDW Joint Venture Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/27/2021. [12213559] [21-55893] (McIntyre, Lann) [Entered: 08/27/2021 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant WDW Joint Venture Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/27/2021. Appellant WDW Joint Venture opening brief due 10/22/2021. Appellees Elisa Acosta, Marcos Acosta and Estate of Evaristo Acosta answering brief due 11/22/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12206736] (RT) [Entered: 08/20/2021 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W D W JOINT VENTURE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lann Gottesman McIntyre

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rita Rebecca Kanno