This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/16/2020 at 06:10:32 (UTC).

Estate of Eira Saenz, et al v. Bitterman

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Estate of Eira Saenz filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bitterman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1285

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

 

Party Details

Defendant

ADAMS COUNTY, COLORADO

Defendant / Appellant

JOHN P. BITTERMAN, Adams County Police Department in his individual capacity

Plaintiff / Appellees

THE ESTATE OF EIRA SAENZ

MARIA DE REFUGIO CORRAL, individually and as personal representative of the estate of Eira Saenz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Courtney Beth Kramer Esq.

Attorney at SGR, LLC

3900 East Mexico Avenue, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80210

Christopher J. Witte

Attorney at SGR, LLC

3900 East Mexico Avenue, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80210

Jonathan Neal Eddy

Attorney at SGR, LLC

3900 East Mexico Avenue, Suite 700

Denver, CO 80210

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Russell O. Newbold-Araya

Attorney at Ramos Law

3000 Youngfield Street, Suite 200

Wheat Ridge, CO 80215

Joseph Philip Ramos Jr.

Attorney at Ramos Law

10190 Bannock Street, Suite 200

Northglenn, CO 80260

Clarence Edwin Gamble

Attorney at Ramos Law

3000 Youngfield Street, Suite 200

Wheat Ridge, CO 80215

Ronald L. Wilcox

Attorney at Wilcox Law Firm

383 Corona Street, Suite 401

Denver, CO 80218

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10776775] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 11/13/2020 for John P. Bitterman. [20-1285] [Entered: 10/07/2020 03:16 PM]

Open Document

[10775505] Attorney admission letter, second notice sent. Attorney admission response date set to 10/13/2020. [20-1285] [Entered: 10/02/2020 08:17 AM]

Open Document

[10771682] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 10/28/2020 for John P. Bitterman. [20-1285] [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:38 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10766999] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 10/01/2020 for Christopher J. Witte. [20-1285] [Entered: 09/01/2020 11:30 AM]

Open Document

[10766970] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by John P. Bitterman. Served on: 09/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1285] CBK [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:46 AM]

Open Document

[10766854] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: transcript order form not filed. Transcript order (or transcript unnecessary notice) due 09/04/2020 for John P. Bitterman. [20-1285] [Entered: 09/01/2020 08:10 AM]

Open Document

[10766783] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jonathan Neal Eddy, Ms. Courtney Beth Kramer, Esq., and Mr. Christopher J. Witte for John P. Bitterman. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1285] [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:26 PM]

Open Document

10766771] Docketing statement filed by John P. Bitterman. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 09/01/2020 by JJH to remove transcript order form as filed separately on 09/01/20] [20-1285] CBK [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:14 PM]

Open Document

[10765263] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Ronald L. Wilcox for The Estate of Eira Saenz and Maria De Refugio Corral. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (party previously disclosed). Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1285] [Entered: 08/25/2020 10:58 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10776775] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 11/13/2020 for John P. Bitterman. [20-1285] [Entered: 10/07/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10775505] Attorney admission letter, second notice sent. Attorney admission response date set to 10/13/2020. [20-1285] [Entered: 10/02/2020 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10771682] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 10/28/2020 for John P. Bitterman. [20-1285] [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10771659] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 10/07/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [20-1285] [Entered: 09/18/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket[10767050] Filed notice record is complete. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Served on 09/01/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 10/13/2020 for John P. Bitterman. [20-1285] [Entered: 09/01/2020 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket[10767009] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/08/2020 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1285] [Entered: 09/01/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766999] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 10/01/2020 for Christopher J. Witte. [20-1285] [Entered: 09/01/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766970] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by John P. Bitterman. Served on: 09/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1285] CBK [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766854] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: transcript order form not filed. Transcript order (or transcript unnecessary notice) due 09/04/2020 for John P. Bitterman. [20-1285] [Entered: 09/01/2020 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766783] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jonathan Neal Eddy, Ms. Courtney Beth Kramer, Esq., and Mr. Christopher J. Witte for John P. Bitterman. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1285] [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10766771] Docketing statement filed by John P. Bitterman. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 09/01/2020 by JJH to remove transcript order form as filed separately on 09/01/20] [20-1285] CBK [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket[10766764] Entry of appearance submitted by Courtney B. Kramer, Christopher J. Witte and Jonathan N. Eddy for Appellant John P. Bitterman for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1285] --[Edited 08/31/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 8/31/2020.] CBK [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10765263] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Ronald L. Wilcox for The Estate of Eira Saenz and Maria De Refugio Corral. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (party previously disclosed). Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1285] [Entered: 08/25/2020 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket[10765257] Entry of appearance submitted by Ronald L. Wilcox for Appellees The Estate of Eira Saenz and Maria De Refugio Corral for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/25/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1285] RLW [Entered: 08/25/2020 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10763243] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/17/2020 Docketing statement, transcript order form, and notice of appearance due 08/31/2020 for John P. Bitterman. Notice of appearance due on 08/31/2020 for Maria De Refugio Corral and The Estate of Eira Saenz [20-1285] [Entered: 08/17/2020 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adams County, Colorado is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald L. Wilcox