This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:05 (UTC).

Esperanza George v. Atascosa County Adult Prob, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Esperanza George filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Atascosa County Adult Prob. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-50652

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

RENEE MERTEN, Director, Atascosa County Adult Probation

ATASCOSA COUNTY ADULT PROBATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

ESPERANZA GEORGE

Pleasanton, TX 78064

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Andrea Sargent-Fambles

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Esperanza George

1317 Jolly Street

Pleasanton, TX 78064

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Esperanza George [19-50652] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:17 PM]

Open Document

UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [19-50652] (LEF) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Andrea Sargent-Fambles for Atascosa County Adult Probation and Ms. Renee Merten for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50652] (Andrea Sargent-Fambles ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:25 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Esperanza George advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-50652] (PAC) [Entered: 09/03/2019 02:45 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102317-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. (Motion for IFP is pending in DC) [19-50652] (CB) [Entered: 07/22/2019 08:28 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:17-CV-505. Electronic ROA due on 09/18/2019. [19-50652] (PAC) [Entered: 09/03/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Esperanza George advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-50652] (PAC) [Entered: 09/03/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [19-50652] (LEF) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 07/31/2019 granting IFP for Appellant Ms. Esperanza George. [19-50652] (LEF) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Andrea Sargent-Fambles for Appellee Renee Merten in 19-50652, Attorney Andrea Sargent-Fambles for Appellee Atascosa County Adult Probation in 19-50652 [19-50652] (LEF) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Andrea Sargent-Fambles for Atascosa County Adult Probation and Ms. Renee Merten for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50652] (Andrea Sargent-Fambles ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102317-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. (Motion for IFP is pending in DC) [19-50652] (CB) [Entered: 07/22/2019 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Esperanza George [19-50652] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.