This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:55 (UTC).

Esau Poree v. Chimdi Akwitti, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Esau Poree filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Chimdi Akwitti. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-50650

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

WARDEN CHIMDI A. AKWITTI

LESLIE L. HARMAN, Chief Classification

SERGEANT PHILLIP A. RAINWATER

Plaintiff / Appellant

ESAU POREE

Livingston, TX 77351-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jason T. Bramow

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Esau Poree

Attorney at CID Polunsky Prison

3872 Fm 350, S.

Livingston, TX 77351-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9103304-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 09/16/2019 for Appellant Esau Poree [19-50650] (CB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 07:43 AM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Esau Poree [19-50650] (RSM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:06 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Esau Poree. Fee deadline satisfied. [19-50650] (CNF) [Entered: 08/28/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9103304-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 09/16/2019 for Appellant Esau Poree [19-50650] (CB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 07:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Esau Poree [19-50650] (RSM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less