This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/31/2022 at 06:09:15 (UTC).

Ervin Valandingham v. Daisy Akinwale, et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Ervin Valandingham filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Daisy Akinwale. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15472

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ERVIN TED VALANDINGHAM

Buckeye, AZ 85326

Defendant / Appellees

DAISY AKINWALE, Medication Nurse

SERVIOUS, First name unknown, Medical Officer Security

DAVID A. ANTONIO, Captain

LAWRENCE ENDE, Medical Provider

FURUAR, First name unknown, Medical Provider

MARIE DEMELLO, Medical Provider

DONNA MENDOZA, Grievance Coordinator

AMBER PUCKET, Medical Grievance Coordinator

CENTURION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ervin Ted Valandingham

Attorney at ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX - LEWIS

P.O. Box 3200

Buckeye, AZ 85326

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah Lynn Barnes Esquire

Attorney at Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson PC

2800 N Central Avenue, Suite 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1580

Danielle Nicole Chronister

Attorney at Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson PC

2800 N Central Avenue, Suite 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1580

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

#2

(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12420539] (CKP) [Entered: 04/13/2022 03:19 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [12425632] (RY) [Entered: 04/19/2022 01:50 PM]

#4

(#4) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 04/20/2022. [Case Number 22-15472: Partially Paid] [12426775] (QDL) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:00 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed Appellant Ervin Ted Valandingham letter dated 04/20/2022 re: Request for copy of rules. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12426778] (QDL) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:01 PM]

7 #1

Main Document

7 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

#8

(#8) Filed Appellant Ervin Ted Valandingham motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/25/2022. [12432212] (QDL) [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:14 AM]

#9

(#9) Filed Appellant Ervin Ted Valandingham letter dated 04/21/2022 re: Adding appellee and ordering record from the district court. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12432227] (QDL) [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:18 AM]

#10

(#10) Streamlined request by Appellant Ervin Ted Valandingham to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The briefing schedule is stayed. See 9th Cir. R. 27-11. [12432472] (JN) [Entered: 04/27/2022 12:13 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Streamlined request by Appellant Ervin Ted Valandingham to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The briefing schedule is stayed. See 9th Cir. R. 27-11. [12432472] (JN) [Entered: 04/27/2022 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed Appellant Ervin Ted Valandingham letter dated 04/21/2022 re: Adding appellee and ordering record from the district court. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12432227] (QDL) [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed Appellant Ervin Ted Valandingham motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/25/2022. [12432212] (QDL) [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [12427250] (CKP) [Entered: 04/21/2022 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Docket(#6) Sent Appellant a copy of the FRAP and Ninth Circuit rules in response to the Form 29 request filed on 04/20/2022. [12426958] (JR) [Entered: 04/20/2022 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Appellant Ervin Ted Valandingham letter dated 04/20/2022 re: Request for copy of rules. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12426778] (QDL) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 04/20/2022. [Case Number 22-15472: Partially Paid] [12426775] (QDL) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [12425632] (RY) [Entered: 04/19/2022 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12420539] (CKP) [Entered: 04/13/2022 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ervin Ted Valandingham opening brief due 05/31/2022. Appellees Daisy Akinwale, David A. Antonio, Centurion, Marie DeMello, Lawrence Ende, Furuar, Donna Mendoza, Amber Pucket and Servious answering brief due 06/28/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12410842] (JMR) [Entered: 04/01/2022 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Lynn Barnes Esquire