This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:05 (UTC).

Ernest Moorer v. Andrew Saul

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Ernest Moorer filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Andrew Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2335

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellant

ERNEST L. MOORER

Milwaukee, WI 53233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Rebecca Taibleson

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

517 E. Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Jonathan H. Koenig

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

517 E. Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Ameenah Lewis

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

200 W. Adams Street

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ernest L. Moorer

2200 W. Kilbourn Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53233

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Mandate

Open Restricted Document #1

Certified copy sent

4 #2

Mandate

4 #1

Final Order with Mandate

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER: Appellant Ernest L. Moorer is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. JR. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Ernest L. Moorer by 08/14/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 3251. [2] [7020673] [19-2335] (VG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:08 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 08/26/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7025857-2] [7025857] [19-2335] (AD) [Entered: 08/26/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(c). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [4] [7025845] [19-2335] (AD) [Entered: 08/26/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Appearance form filed by Attorney Ameenah Lewis for Appellee Andrew M. Saul. [3] [7025213] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2335] [Edited 08/22/2019 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Lewis, Ameenah) [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: Appellant Ernest L. Moorer is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. JR. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Ernest L. Moorer by 08/14/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 3251. [2] [7020673] [19-2335] (VG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) U.S. civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Ernest L. Moorer by 07/19/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 07/29/2019. [1] [7017305] [19-2335] (PS) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less