This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2019 at 06:05:36 (UTC).

Erin Johnson v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Erin Johnson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1334

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

ERIN JOHNSON

Defendant / Appellant

ENHANCED RECOVERY COMPANY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel A. Edelman

Attorney at EDELMAN COMBS LATTURNER & GOODWIN, LLC

20 S. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Cassandra P. Miller

Attorney at EDELMAN COMBS LATTURNER & GOODWIN, LLC

20 S. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Cathleen M. Combs

Attorney at EDELMAN COMBS LATTURNER & GOODWIN, LLC

20 S. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Scott Stephen Gallagher

Attorney at SMITH, GAMBRELL & RUSSELL, LLP

50 N. Laura Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Richard Dean Rivera

Attorney at SMITH, GAMBRELL & RUSSELL, LLP

50 N. Laura Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Added Attorney(s) Cassandra P. Miller for party(s) Appellant Erin Johnson, in case 19-1210 Attorney(s) Cassandra P. Miller for party(s) Appellee Erin Johnson, in case 19-1334 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Cassandra P. Miller for Appellant Erin Johnson in 19-1210, Appellee Erin Johnson in 19-1334. [7] [6992675] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1210, 19-1334]--[Edited 03/22/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Miller, Cassandra) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:51 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed Response by Appellee Erin Johnson in 19-1334 to Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company LLC Jurisdictional Memorandum. [6][6992248] [19-1334, 19-1210] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:51 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#1

Civil Case

#14

(#14) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance form filed by Attorney Daniel A. Edelman for Appellant Erin Johnson in 19-1210, Appellee Erin Johnson in 19-1334. [14] [6997191] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1210, 19-1334]--[Edited 04/11/2019 by AD to reflect proper document filed.] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:58 AM]

#9

(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Richard D. Rivera for Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. [9] [6992812] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1334]-[Edited 03/25/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Rivera, Richard) [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:44 AM]

#8

(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Scott S. Gallagher for Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. [8] [6992801] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1334] (Gallagher, Scott) [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:23 AM]

#10

(#10) ORDER: Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC by 04/10/2019. JR [10] [6993454] [19-1334] (MM) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:23 AM]

#2

(#2) ORDER: Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6987160] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC by 03/11/2019. DW [2] [6987160] [19-1334] (AP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:57 PM]

3 #2

Declaration of Daniel A. Edelman/Exhibit A

3 #1

Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief of Plaintiff-Appellant Erin J

#5

(#5) ORDER re: Jurisdictional memorandum. IT IS ORDERED that appellee file, on or before March 20, 2019, a response to appellant Enhanced Recovery Company LLCs filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of February 26, 2019. DW [5] [6990235] [19-1334] (AP) [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:17 PM]

15 #2

Additional Appendix of Plaintiff-Appellant Erin Johnson

#11

(#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Cathleen M. Combs for Appellant Erin Johnson [13] [6995613] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1210, 19-1334]--[Edited 04/04/2019 by MM to reflect party attorney represents. Also edited to reflect addition of counsel.] (Combs, Cathleen) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:11 PM]

#5

(#4) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC in 19-1334. [4] [6990006] [19-1334, 19-1210] (Gallagher, Scott) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:21 PM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Submitted appellant brief by Daniel A. Edelman for Appellant Erin Johnson in 19-1210. [15] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6998086] [19-1210, 19-1334] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 04/15/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance form filed by Attorney Daniel A. Edelman for Appellant Erin Johnson in 19-1210, Appellee Erin Johnson in 19-1334. [14] [6997191] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1210, 19-1334]--[Edited 04/11/2019 by AD to reflect proper document filed.] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Cathleen M. Combs for Appellant Erin Johnson [13] [6995613] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1210, 19-1334]--[Edited 04/04/2019 by MM to reflect party attorney represents. Also edited to reflect addition of counsel.] (Combs, Cathleen) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • (#12) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Cassandra P. Miller for Appellant Erin Johnson in 19-1210, Attorney Cassandra P. Miller for Appellee Erin Johnson in 19-1334 has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [12] [6994904] [19-1210, 19-1334] (LJ) [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 19-1210 [11] [6993965] [19-1334] (Gallagher, Scott) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC by 04/10/2019. JR [10] [6993454] [19-1334] (MM) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Richard D. Rivera for Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. [9] [6992812] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1334]-[Edited 03/25/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Rivera, Richard) [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Scott S. Gallagher for Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. [8] [6992801] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1334] (Gallagher, Scott) [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Added Attorney(s) Cassandra P. Miller for party(s) Appellant Erin Johnson, in case 19-1210 Attorney(s) Cassandra P. Miller for party(s) Appellee Erin Johnson, in case 19-1334 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Cassandra P. Miller for Appellant Erin Johnson in 19-1210, Appellee Erin Johnson in 19-1334. [7] [6992675] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1210, 19-1334]--[Edited 03/22/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Miller, Cassandra) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed Response by Appellee Erin Johnson in 19-1334 to Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company LLC Jurisdictional Memorandum. [6][6992248] [19-1334, 19-1210] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 03/20/2019 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER re: Jurisdictional memorandum. IT IS ORDERED that appellee file, on or before March 20, 2019, a response to appellant Enhanced Recovery Company LLCs filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of February 26, 2019. DW [5] [6990235] [19-1334] (AP) [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC in 19-1334. [4] [6990006] [19-1334, 19-1210] (Gallagher, Scott) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion filed by Appellant Erin Johnson in 19-1210 to extend time to file appellant brief. [3] [6989565] [19-1210, 19-1334] (Edelman, Daniel) [Entered: 03/08/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6987160] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC by 03/11/2019. DW [2] [6987160] [19-1334] (AP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC by 03/01/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 03/11/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/08/2019 for Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. [1] [6987050] [19-1334] (MM) [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.