This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/26/2021 at 06:04:34 (UTC).

Ericsson Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 Ericsson Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1565

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

ERICSSON INC.

TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON

Defendant / Appellants

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

SAMSUNG RESEARCH AMERICA

Amicus Curiae

CHRISTA LASER

PETER K. YU

ANN BARTOW

JORGE L. CONTRERAS

MICHAEL A. CARRIER

JOSHUA D. SARNOFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

James A. Barta

Attorney at James Barta

600 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20037

Jeffrey A. Lamken

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Michael Gregory Pattillo Jr.

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Rayiner Hashem

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Jennifer Elizabeth Fischell

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

430 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Elizabeth Clarke

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Christine Michelle Woodin

Attorney at McKool Smith PC

300 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Theodore Stevenson III

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 Crescent Court

Dallas, TX 75201

Eugene Alexis Sokoloff

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Nicholas M. Mathews

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 Crescent Court

Dallas, TX 75201

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

104 E Houston Street

Marshall, TX 75671

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

John C. O'Quinn

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Francis Christopher Mizzo Esq.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

655 15Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Greg Arovas

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue, Citigroup Center

New York, NY 10022

William H. Burgess

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Devon Wesley Edwards

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Stephen Marshall

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

1875 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Indranil Mukerji Esq.

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

1875 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

18 #2

Amicus Brief International Intellectual Property Law Professors

18 #1

Motion for Leave to File

#16

#15

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED AMICUS BRIEF FILED by Ann Bartow, Professor Michael A. Carrier, Professor Jorge L. Contreras, Christa Laser, Joshua D. Sarnoff and Peter K. Yu. Service: 03/16/2021 by email. [762694]--[Edited 03/17/2021 by KMH - compliance review complete] [Indranil Mukerji] [Entered: 03/16/2021 02:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Certificate of Interest for Amici Curiae Ann Bartow, Professor Michael A. Carrier, Professor Jorge L. Contreras, Christa Laser, Joshua D. Sarnoff and Peter K. Yu. Service: 03/16/2021 by email. [762684] [21-1565] [Indranil Mukerji] [Entered: 03/16/2021 02:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Entry of appearance for Indranil Mukerji; Stephen A. Marshall; Devon W. Edwards as counsel for Amici Curiae Ann Bartow, Professor Michael A. Carrier, Professor Jorge L. Contreras, Christa Laser, Joshua D. Sarnoff and Peter K. Yu. Service: 03/16/2021 by email. [762681] [21-1565] [Indranil Mukerji] [Entered: 03/16/2021 02:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Amici Curiae Ann Bartow, Professor Michael A. Carrier, Professor Jorge L. Contreras, Christa Laser, Joshua D. Sarnoff and Peter K. Yu, Amicus Curiae Brief [ # 18 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 03/22/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [762345] [KMH] [Entered: 03/15/2021 03:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER filed granting motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief [ # 18 ]. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [762328] [LMS] [Entered: 03/15/2021 03:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION of International Intellectual Property Law Professors for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. Service: 03/01/2021 by email. [759351] [21-1565] [Indranil Mukerji] [Entered: 03/01/2021 05:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) 6 paper copies of Doc. No. [ # 16 ] received from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Research America. [759205] [VDW] [Entered: 03/01/2021 01:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MODIFIED ENTRY: BRIEF FILED by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Research America. Service: 02/22/2021 by email. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [757849] --[Edited 02/23/2021 by KMH - compliance review complete] [William Burgess] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corrected Entry of appearance for Jeffrey A. Lamken; Michael G. Pattillo, Jr.; Rayiner I. Hashem; James A. Barta; Jennifer E. Fischell; Eugene A. Sokoloff; Elizabeth K. Clarke; Theodore Stevenson, III; Nicholas M. Mathews; Christine M. Woodin; Samuel F. Baxter as counsel for Appellees Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Service: 02/12/2021 by email. [755962] [21-1565] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER filed granting motion [ # 4 ] to the following extent: The appellees' response brief is due no later than April 2, 2021; and Samsung's reply brief and the joint appendix are due no later than April 12, 2021. The parties shall file six paper copies of each brief and the joint appendix within three business days after the court completes its compliance review of each of those documents. The appeal will be placed on the June 2021 oral argument calendar. No extensions of time should be anticipated. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [755652] [LMS] [Entered: 02/12/2021 07:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Research America to response [ # 9 ]. Service: 02/08/2021 by email. [754372] [21-1565] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 02/08/2021 09:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE of Appellees Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson to the motion to expedite briefing [ # 4 ], motion to expedite hearing [ # 4 ]. Service: 02/03/2021 by email. [753808] [21-1565] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Service: 02/03/2021 by email. [753804] [21-1565] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Jeffrey A. Lamken; Michael G. Pattillo Jr.; Rayiner I. Hashem; James A. Barta; Jennifer E. Fischell; Eugene A. Sokoloff; Elizabeth K. Clarke; Theodore Stevens, III; Nicholas M. Mathews; Christine M. Woodin; Blake H. Bailey; Samuel F. Baxter as counsel for Appellees Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Service: 02/03/2021 by email. [753802] [21-1565] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 12 ] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Research America. Service: 02/02/2021 by email. [753332] [21-1565] [William Burgess] [Entered: 02/02/2021 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Any response to the motion [ # 4 ] shall be filed no later than February 3, 2021. Any reply in support of the motion is due no later than February 8, 2021. Samsung's opening brief is due no later than February 22, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [752015] [LMS] [Entered: 01/27/2021 10:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Research America to expedite briefing schedule, to expedite hearing. Service: 01/26/2021 by email. [751959] [21-1565] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 01/26/2021 11:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Research America. Service: 01/26/2021 by email. [751958] [21-1565] [John O'Quinn] [Entered: 01/26/2021 11:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for John C. O'Quinn; Gregory S. Arovas; F. Christopher Mizzo; William H. Burgess as counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Research America. Service: 01/26/2021 by email. [751957] [21-1565] [William Burgess] [Entered: 01/26/2021 11:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/15/2021. [751404] Entry of Appearance is due 02/08/2021. Certificate of Interest is due 02/08/2021. Docketing Statement is due 02/08/2021. Appellant's brief is due 03/26/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 01/25/2021 10:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAMSUNG RESEARCH AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where ERICSSON INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant