This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/09/2022 at 06:07:10 (UTC).

Ericka Jackson v. Trans Union LLC

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 Ericka Jackson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Trans Union LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1408

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ERICKA JACKSON

Defendant / Appellee

TRANS UNION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dennis D. McCarty Esq.

Attorney at McCarty Law Firm

P.O. Box 111070

Carrollton, TX 75011

Gary Schafkopf Esq.

Attorney at Hopkins & Schafkopf

11 Bala Avenue

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

Matthew B. Weisberg Esq.

Attorney at Weisberg Law

7 South Morton Avenue

Morton, PA 19070

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Camille R. Nicodemus Esq.

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Katherine E. Carlton Robinson Esq.

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Casey B. Green Esq.

Attorney at Sidkoff Pincus & Green

1101 Market Street, Suite 2700

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER (Clerk) The appeals involve issues similar to those raised in three consolidated appeals that have already been fully briefed and argued (Bibbs, Parker, and Samoura v. Trans Union LLC. Nos. 21-1350, 21-1527, and 21-1530). Merits briefings in the appeals is STAYED until Bibbs, Parke, and Samoura have been resolved. After the Court issues its mandates in those appeals, this stay will be lifted and these appeals will proceed in an appropriate manner. If any party objects to staying these appeals, a motion seeking relief should be filed within fourteen days of this order. This stay applies only to merits briefing and not to the following obligations: fee payments, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.3(a); ordering transcripts, Fed. R. App. P. 10(b), 3d Cir. L.A.R. 11.1; filing case-opening forms, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.2.2, 33.2; and entering appearances of counsel, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 46.2. Failure to timely comply with those obligations may result in dismissal. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 107.2, 107.2(a). [22-1406, 22-1408, 22-1407, 22-1409] (TMM) [Entered: 03/10/2022 12:49 PM]

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

DC Order 2/2/22

1 #3

DC Memorandum 2/2/22

1 #4

caption

1 #5

Standing Order

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Appellee(s) Trans Union, LLC. [22-1408] (CRN) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:31 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Trans Union LLC. [22-1408] (CRN) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:33 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew B. Weisberg on behalf of Appellant(s) Ericka Jackson. [22-1408] (MBW) [Entered: 03/23/2022 03:59 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Ericka Jackson. [22-1408] (MBW) [Entered: 03/23/2022 04:00 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Ericka Jackson. [22-1408] (MBW) [Entered: 03/23/2022 04:00 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Ericka Jackson advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: 10/19/21, to be filed by [22-1408] (MBW) [Entered: 03/23/2022 04:01 PM]

10 #1

Transcript Scheduling Order Issued

10 #2

Transcript Scheduling Order

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part II) filed by Kathy Feldman, OCR. for date(s) of 10/19/2021. [22-1408] (JMG) [Entered: 04/28/2022 10:08 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part II) filed by Kathy Feldman, OCR. for date(s) of 10/19/2021. [22-1408] (JMG) [Entered: 04/28/2022 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER to Court Reporter Mike Finney directing transcripts, ordered on 03/23/2022 , to be filed by 04/25/2022. (TMM) [Entered: 03/24/2022 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Ericka Jackson advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: 10/19/21, to be filed by [22-1408] (MBW) [Entered: 03/23/2022 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Ericka Jackson. [22-1408] (MBW) [Entered: 03/23/2022 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Ericka Jackson. [22-1408] (MBW) [Entered: 03/23/2022 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew B. Weisberg on behalf of Appellant(s) Ericka Jackson. [22-1408] (MBW) [Entered: 03/23/2022 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Trans Union LLC. [22-1408] (CRN) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Camille R. Nicodemus on behalf of Appellee(s) Trans Union, LLC. [22-1408] (CRN) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) The appeals involve issues similar to those raised in three consolidated appeals that have already been fully briefed and argued (Bibbs, Parker, and Samoura v. Trans Union LLC. Nos. 21-1350, 21-1527, and 21-1530). Merits briefings in the appeals is STAYED until Bibbs, Parke, and Samoura have been resolved. After the Court issues its mandates in those appeals, this stay will be lifted and these appeals will proceed in an appropriate manner. If any party objects to staying these appeals, a motion seeking relief should be filed within fourteen days of this order. This stay applies only to merits briefing and not to the following obligations: fee payments, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.3(a); ordering transcripts, Fed. R. App. P. 10(b), 3d Cir. L.A.R. 11.1; filing case-opening forms, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.2.2, 33.2; and entering appearances of counsel, 3d Cir. L.A.R. 46.2. Failure to timely comply with those obligations may result in dismissal. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 107.2, 107.2(a). [22-1406, 22-1408, 22-1407, 22-1409] (TMM) [Entered: 03/10/2022 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 03/10/2022 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ericka Jackson in District Court No. 2-21-cv-00023. (TMM) [Entered: 03/10/2022 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine E. Carlton Robinson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASEY GREEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Camille R. Nicodemus Esq.