This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/09/2022 at 06:01:39 (UTC).

Erich Smith, et al v. President United States of Ame

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Erich Smith, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against President United States of Ame. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3091

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ERICH SMITH

FRANK E. GARWOOD, JR.

MARIBEL LORENZO

DR. DANIEL DONOFRIO

Defendant / Appellee

PRESIDENT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dana Wefer Esq.

375 Sylvan Avenue

Englewood Cliffs, NJ 07632

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah W. Carroll Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Marleigh Dover Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

1100 L Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Casen Ross Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Angela Juneau Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Charles W. Scarborough Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Abby C. Wright Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) ORDER (Clerk) At the direction of the Court, the motion by Appellants for Leave to File a Supplemental Appendix is DENIED. (EAF) [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:40 AM]

#43

(#43) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Daniel Donofrio, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Erich Smith to File Supplemental Appendix. Certificate of Service dated 12/22/2021. Service made by ECF. --[Edited 12/28/2021 by EAF - Text edited] [21-3091] (DW) [Entered: 12/22/2021 12:34 PM]

#39

(#39) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Daniel Donofrio, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Erich Smith. Certificate of Service dated 12/15/2021 by ECF. --[Edited 12/16/2021 by EAF - Texted edited] --[Edited 01/04/2022 by EAF - Supplemental Appendix has been removed as the motion to file is DENIED] [21-3091] (DW) [Entered: 12/15/2021 04:41 PM]

#37

(#37) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX on behalf of Appellee President United States of America. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2021 by ECF. [21-3091] (SWC) [Entered: 12/14/2021 05:21 PM]

33 #2

Supplemental Appendix

33 #1

Motion(s)

#32

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER (Clerk) At the direction of the Court, the motion by Appellants for Leave to File a Supplemental Appendix is DENIED. (EAF) [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket(#44) COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Motion to File Supplemental Appendix received from Appellants Daniel Donofrio, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Erich Smith. (EAF) [Entered: 12/28/2021 08:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Daniel Donofrio, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Erich Smith to File Supplemental Appendix. Certificate of Service dated 12/22/2021. Service made by ECF. --[Edited 12/28/2021 by EAF - Text edited] [21-3091] (DW) [Entered: 12/22/2021 12:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket(#42) SECOND TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Attorney Dana Wefer, Esq. for Appellants Erich Smith, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Daniel Donofrio TO comply with Text Only Order filed on 12/16/21. Due on or before 12/27/2021. (EAF) [Entered: 12/21/2021 09:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#41) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Daniel Donofrio, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Erich Smith - Reply Brief with Supplemental Appendix attached. Copies: 7. (LM) [Entered: 12/20/2021 12:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#40) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Attorney Dana Wefer, Esq. for Appellants Erich Smith, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Daniel Donofrio to file a Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix for the Supplemental Appendix attached to the Reply Brief filed on 12/15/21. Due on or before 12/20/2021. (EAF) [Entered: 12/16/2021 01:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Daniel Donofrio, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Erich Smith. Certificate of Service dated 12/15/2021 by ECF. --[Edited 12/16/2021 by EAF - Texted edited] --[Edited 01/04/2022 by EAF - Supplemental Appendix has been removed as the motion to file is DENIED] [21-3091] (DW) [Entered: 12/15/2021 04:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Docket(#38) COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Electronic re-filing of Supplemental Appendix as a separate pdf transaction received from Appellee President United States of America. (MCW) [Entered: 12/15/2021 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX on behalf of Appellee President United States of America. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2021 by ECF. [21-3091] (SWC) [Entered: 12/14/2021 05:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Docket(#36) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Sarah W. Carroll, Esq., counsel for Appellee President United States of America, to electronically re-file the Supplemental Appendix as a separate pdf transaction. Due on or before 12/17/2021. (MCW) [Entered: 12/14/2021 03:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Daniel Donofrio, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Erich Smith to accept The Motion for an Injunction Pending Appeal is oversized. that is It contains 1,804 words over the limit of 5,200.. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2021. Service made by Email. [21-3091] (DW) [Entered: 11/18/2021 05:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Daniel Donofrio, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Erich Smith to Expedite Appellants wish to expedite their appeal from District Court Order denying an injunction. A proposed briefing schedule is enclosed and Appellee was on notice that Appellants would so move.. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-3091] (DW) [Entered: 11/18/2021 05:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Daniel Donofrio, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Erich Smith for injunction. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-3091] SEND TO MERITS--[Edited 11/19/2021 by SLC] (DW) [Entered: 11/18/2021 05:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Charles W. Scarborough on behalf of Appellee(s) Joseph Biden, President of the United States. [21-3091] (CWS) [Entered: 11/12/2021 12:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Casen B. Ross on behalf of Appellee(s) Joseph R. Biden, President of the United States of America. [21-3091] (CR) [Entered: 11/11/2021 10:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Abby C. Wright on behalf of Appellee(s) Joseph R. Biden, President of the United States. [21-3091] (ACW) [Entered: 11/11/2021 07:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Andrew Ruymann, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) President of the United States of America. [21-3091] (JAR) [Entered: 11/11/2021 09:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Angela Juneau, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) President of the United States of America. [21-3091] (AJ) [Entered: 11/11/2021 09:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 11/10/2021 04:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Daniel Donofrio, Frank E. Garwood, Jr., Maribel Lorenzo and Erich Smith in District Court No. 1-21-cv-19457. (TMM) [Entered: 11/10/2021 04:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less