Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/15/2021 at 06:21:24 (UTC).

Eric Robinson v. Kairn Borzakian, et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Eric Robinson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kairn Borzakian. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55239

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MALISA CHESSLOCK, individual capacity

KAIRN BORZAKIAN, individual capacity

JOHN DOE, 1-5

RUBY ARIAS, District Attorney individual capacity

DANIEL FELDSTURN, Judge, individual capacity

SUSAN TANNENBAWM

LOS ANGELES COUNTY

MALISA DECKER, individual capacity

JANE DOE

Plaintiff / Appellant

ERIC ROBINSON

Chatsworth, CA 91313

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Eric Robinson

P.O. Box 3352

Chatsworth, CA 91313

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MANDATE ISSUED. (RRC, MHM and DAB) [12106783] (RR) [Entered: 05/10/2021 07:16 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed order (RICHARD R. CLIFTON, MARY H. MURGUIA and DANIEL A. BRESS) : A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; In re San Vicente Med. Partners Ltd., 865 F.2d 1128, 1131 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (magistrate judge order not final or appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED.. [12077740] (RT) [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:13 PM]

#4

(#4) Received notice of change of address dated from Eric Robinson. New address: P.O.Box 3352 Chatsworth CA 91313. [12051767] (JFF) [Entered: 03/24/2021 10:29 AM]

#3

(#3) Received copy of District Court order. [12044708] (JFF) [Entered: 03/17/2021 02:29 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Eric Robinson motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/12/2021. [12042559] (JPD) [Entered: 03/16/2021 10:06 AM]

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MANDATE ISSUED. (RRC, MHM and DAB) [12106783] (RR) [Entered: 05/10/2021 07:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed order (RICHARD R. CLIFTON, MARY H. MURGUIA and DANIEL A. BRESS) : A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; In re San Vicente Med. Partners Ltd., 865 F.2d 1128, 1131 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (magistrate judge order not final or appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED.. [12077740] (RT) [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received notice of change of address dated from Eric Robinson. New address: P.O.Box 3352 Chatsworth CA 91313. [12051767] (JFF) [Entered: 03/24/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received copy of District Court order. [12044708] (JFF) [Entered: 03/17/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Eric Robinson motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/12/2021. [12042559] (JPD) [Entered: 03/16/2021 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Eric Robinson opening brief due 05/11/2021. [12042493] (JPD) [Entered: 03/16/2021 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF is a litigant