This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:01 (UTC).

Eric Lougin, et al v. City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Eric Lougin filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of St Louis, Missouri. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2469

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Claudia Roe, in her official capacity

Shawn Ordway, in his offical capacity

Freddie Dunlap, in his official and individual capacity

St. Louis City Board of Equalization, City of Saint Louis Assessor President of the BOE

Chris Roth, in his official and individual capacity

City of St. Louis, Missouri

John Does, 1-4, in their official capacity

Grand Center, Inc.

Rick Lauman, in his official capacity

Plaintiff / Appellants

Francesco R. Russo

Saint Louis, MO 63108

Eric D. Lougin

Saint Louis, MO 63108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Megan Kathleen G. Bruyns

Attorney at CITY COUNSELOR'S OFFICE

314 City Hall, 1200 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63103-0000

Erin K. McGowan

Attorney at CITY COUNSELOR'S OFFICE

314 City Hall, 1200 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63103-0000

Matthew Scott McBride

Attorney at LASHLY & BAER

714 Locust Street

Saint Louis, MO 63101-0000

Matthew S. McBride

Attorney at LASHLY & BAER

714 Locust Street

Saint Louis, MO 63101-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Francesco R. Russo

3716 Grandel Square

Saint Louis, MO 63108

Eric D. Lougin

3716 Grandel Square

Saint Louis, MO 63108

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

appellant brief

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Matthew S McBride for Appellee Grand Center w/service 07/31/2019 [4814110] [19-2469] (MSM) [Entered: 07/31/2019 11:32 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Erin K. McGowan for Appellees City of St. Louis, Missouri, John Does, Freddie Dunlap, Mr. Rick Lauman, Mr. Shawn Ordway, Claudia Roe, Chris Roth and St. Louis City Board of Equalization w/service 07/25/2019 [4812087] [19-2469] (EKM) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:16 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Eric D. Lougin and Francesco R. Russo due 08/26/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4808677] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:03 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: Vacating this court's previous order dated 7/15/2019, Directing Appellant to pay docketing fee Doc No. [ # 4808030-2 ]. The District Court has notified this court that the filing and docketing fee has been paid. This court's previous order, issued Jul 15, 2019, directing Appellant to pay the fee is hereby vacated. [4808674] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:55 PM]

Open Document #2

Case Caption

Open Document #1

Letter From Clerk's Office

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/05/2019, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [4808030] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:45 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 7/10/19, docket entries, Memorandum & Order 7/08/19. [4808029] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:44 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4808017] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:34 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Eric D. Lougin and Mr. Francesco R. Russo. w/service 08/26/2019 , Length: 6798 words. 5 copies made by USCA-8. Brief of City of St. Louis, Missouri, John Does, Freddie Dunlap, Grand Center, Rick Lauman, Shawn Ordway, Claudia Roe, Chris Roth and St. Louis City Board of Equalization due on 09/20/2019. [4823234] [19-2469] (MDS) [Entered: 08/26/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Matthew S McBride for Appellee Grand Center w/service 07/31/2019 [4814110] [19-2469] (MSM) [Entered: 07/31/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Erin K. McGowan for Appellees City of St. Louis, Missouri, John Does, Freddie Dunlap, Mr. Rick Lauman, Mr. Shawn Ordway, Claudia Roe, Chris Roth and St. Louis City Board of Equalization w/service 07/25/2019 [4812087] [19-2469] (EKM) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Eric D. Lougin and Francesco R. Russo due 08/26/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4808677] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-2469: paid - cs] Fee paid 7/10/19 int D. Court. [4808675] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: Vacating this court's previous order dated 7/15/2019, Directing Appellant to pay docketing fee Doc No. [ # 4808030-2 ]. The District Court has notified this court that the filing and docketing fee has been paid. This court's previous order, issued Jul 15, 2019, directing Appellant to pay the fee is hereby vacated. [4808674] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. [4808661] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 08/05/2019, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [4808030] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 7/10/19, docket entries, Memorandum & Order 7/08/19. [4808029] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4808017] [19-2469] (TMF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.