This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2019 at 06:07:32 (UTC).

Eric Jenkins v. Illinois Department of Correct, et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Eric Jenkins filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Illinois Department of Correct. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1350

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ST. JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL, Neurologist Department

WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.

ILLINOIS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Plaintiff / Appellant

ERIC T. JENKINS

Chicago, IL 60608-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Eric T. Jenkins

Attorney at STATEVILLE CORRECTIONAL CENTER

2700 S. California Avenue, P.O. Box 089002

Chicago, IL 60608-0000

 

Court Documents

3 #2

PLRA Fee Notice AC

3 #1

PLRA D.C. Denial of IFP

#2

(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6987133] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [19-1350] (VG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 12:44 PM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#5

RESTRICTED

1 #3

PLRA Fee Notice DC

#4

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Notice to District Court

#1

Civil Rights Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed Appellant Eric T. Jenkins Amended Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [5] [6998551] [19-1350] (AP) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Appellant Eric T. Jenkins Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [4] [6996425] [19-1350] (AP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Eric T. Jenkins leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 04/02/2019. [3] [6994896] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/02/2019. [19-1350] (DSL) [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6987133] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [19-1350] (VG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Transcript information sheet due by 03/12/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Eric T. Jenkins by 03/04/2019. [1] [6987131] [19-1350] (VG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.