This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:47 (UTC).

Eric Flores v. State of Texas

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Eric Flores filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Texas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-50644

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

STATE OF TEXAS

Plaintiff / Appellant

ERIC FLORES

Kenedy, TX 78119-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Eric Flores

Attorney at CID Connally Prison

899 Fm 632

Kenedy, TX 78119-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9103315-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Miscellaneous due on 08/22/2019 for Appellant Eric Flores. (Monitoring for unpaid sanction) [19-50644] (CB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 07:50 AM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Eric Flores [19-50644] (SDH) [Entered: 07/15/2019 09:14 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9108013-2] [19-50644] (CCR) [Entered: 07/29/2019 12:41 PM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9103001-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Eric Flores. [9103001-1] [19-50644] (CCR) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:53 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9108013-2] [19-50644] (CCR) [Entered: 07/29/2019 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9103315-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Miscellaneous due on 08/22/2019 for Appellant Eric Flores. (Monitoring for unpaid sanction) [19-50644] (CB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 07:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9103001-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Eric Flores. [9103001-1] [19-50644] (CCR) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Eric Flores [19-50644] (SDH) [Entered: 07/15/2019 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less