This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/18/2020 at 06:17:18 (UTC).

Equal Employment Opportunity v. Austal USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 Equal Employment Opportunity filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Austal USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11891

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

Defendant / Appellee

AUSTAL USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kurt S. Fischer

Attorney at EEOC

1130 22Nd St S Ste 2000

Birmingham, AL 35205

Gina Elaine Pearson

Attorney at Haynes & Haynes, PC

1600 Woodmere Dr

Birmingham, AL 35226

Gerald L. Miller

Attorney at EEOC

1130 22Nd St S Ste 2000

Birmingham, AL 35205

Suntrease Williams-Maynard

Attorney at U.S. Equal Employment Oppurtunity Commission

63 S Royal St Ste 504

Mobile, AL 36602

Russell Paul Parker

Attorney at EEOC

1130 22Nd St S Ste 2000

Birmingham, AL 35205

Marsha Lynn Rucker

Attorney at EEOC

1130 22Nd St S Ste 2000

Birmingham, AL 35205

Jeremy D. Horowitz

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

131 M St Ne Fl 5

Washington, DC 20507-0004

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kristin Taylor Parsons

Attorney at Austal USA

Po Box 1049

Mobile, AL 36633

Kathryn Morris Willis

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

11 N Water St Ste 22200, Po Box 2287

Mobile, AL 36602

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

USDC Order- doc #98

Open Document #4

USDC Judgment- doc #99

Open Document #5

USDC Order- doc #108

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Equal Employment Opportunity Commission's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 07/08/2020 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Equal Employment Opportunity Commission is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9131548-2 ] [Entered: 07/08/2020 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Motion is Unopposed. [9131548-1] [20-11891] (ECF: Jeremy Horowitz) [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kristin Parsons for Austal USA, LLC Attorney Kristin Taylor Parsons for Appellee Austal USA, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11891] (ECF: Kristin Parsons) [Entered: 06/16/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Equal Employment Opportunity Commission is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9111258-2 ] Appellants brief due on 07/20/2020, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. [Entered: 06/15/2020 07:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTIME SENSITIVE MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 07/20/2020 filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Motion is Unopposed. [9111258-1] [20-11891] (ECF: Jeremy Horowitz) [Entered: 06/12/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristin Taylor Parsons for Austal USA, LLC. [20-11891] (ECF: Kristin Parsons) [Entered: 06/02/2020 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/29/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/02/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jeremy D. Horowitz for Appellant Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. No hearings. [20-11891] (ECF: Jeremy Horowitz) [Entered: 06/02/2020 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jeremy D. Horowitz for Appellant Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. [20-11891] (ECF: Jeremy Horowitz) [Entered: 06/02/2020 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jeremy D. Horowitz for Appellant Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11891] (ECF: Jeremy Horowitz) [Entered: 06/02/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeremy D. Horowitz for EEOC [20-11891] (ECF: Jeremy Horowitz) [Entered: 06/02/2020 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Equal Employment Opportunity Commission on 05/19/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Required. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/02/2020 as to Appellant Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/16/2020 as to Appellee Austal USA, LLC [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Austal USA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathryn Morris Willis