This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2021 at 06:12:33 (UTC).

Epic Games, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Epic Games, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Apple, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16695

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EPIC GAMES, INC.

Counter Claimant

APPLE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary Bornstein

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

M. Brent Byars

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Wes Earnhardt

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Yonatan Even

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Katherine Forrest

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Paul Jeffrey Riehle

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Rachel Susan Brass

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Richard Joseph Doren

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Karen L. Dunn

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1047

Samuel Eckman

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Julian Kleinbrodt

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jason C. Lo

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Mark Andrew Perry

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Cynthia Richman

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Jagannathan Srinivasan

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Daniel Glen Swanson

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Joshua M. Wesneski

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Cross-Appeal Briefing Chart

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellant Apple, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/21/2021. First cross appeal brief due 12/21/2021 for Epic Games, Inc.. Second brief on cross appeal due 01/20/2022 for Apple, Inc.. Third brief on cross appeal due 02/22/2022 for Epic Games, Inc.. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [12256683] [21-16695, 21-16506] (JBS) [Entered: 10/14/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Epic Games, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel Eckman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason C Lo