This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/22/2022 at 06:18:39 (UTC).

Epic Games, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Epic Games, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Apple, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16506

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Appellant

EPIC GAMES, INC.

Counter Claimant

APPLE, INC.

Amicus Curiae

38 LAW, ECONOMICS, AND BUSINESS PROFESSORS

TILE

COMMITTEE TO SUPPORT THE ANTITRUST LAWS

MATCH GROUP, INC.

PUBLIC CITIZEN

BASECAMP

CONSUMER FEDERATION OF AMERICA AND DEVELOPERS

KNITRINO

14 LAW, ECONOMICS, AND BUSINESS PROFESSORS

COALITION FOR APP FAIRNESS

ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

MICROSOFT CORPORATION

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE

AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION

ACT | THE APP ASSOCIATION

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Yonatan Even

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Gary Bornstein

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

M. Brent Byars

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Wes Earnhardt

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Katherine Forrest

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Paul Jeffrey Riehle

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Peter Barbur

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Tom Goldstein

Attorney at Goldstein & Russell, PC

7475 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 850

Bethesda, MD 20814

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Daniel Glen Swanson

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Rachel Susan Brass

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Richard Joseph Doren

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Karen L. Dunn

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1047

Samuel Eckman

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Julian Kleinbrodt

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jason C. Lo

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Mark Andrew Perry

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP

2001 M Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Cynthia Richman

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Jagannathan Srinivasan

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Joshua M. Wesneski

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5306

33 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#164

(#178) Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae - Pending Unfair Competition Law Practitioners and Scholars in 21-16506, 21-16695 reply to response (motion to become amicus). Date of service: 06/09/2022. [12467944] [21-16506, 21-16695] (Kesselman, David) [Entered: 06/09/2022 05:22 PM]

#162

(#176) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Motion [ # 173 ] and opposition [ # 175 ] (ECF Filing) is referred to panel.; Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus is referred to panel. (see attached PDF for complete order addressing Dkt No. 173) [12463052] [21-16506, 21-16695] (GS) [Entered: 06/03/2022 12:27 PM]

#161

(#175) Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. in 21-16506, Appellant Apple, Inc. in 21-16695 response opposing motion ([ # 173 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 173 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus). Date of service: 06/02/2022. [12462020] [21-16506, 21-16695] (Perry, Mark) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:54 AM]

159 #2

Amicus Brief

159 #1

Motion to File Amicus Brief

#154

No Description Available

#153

No Description Available

#150

(#172) Received 3 paper copies of further excerpts of record [ # 164 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellant Epic Games, Inc. [12460123] [21-16506, 21-16695] (SD) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:22 PM]

#149

(#171) Received 6 paper copies of Third Brief on Cross-Appeal [ # 163 ] filed by Epic Games, Inc.. [12460114] [21-16506, 21-16695] (SD) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:19 PM]

148 #2

Additional Document

148 #1

Main Document

#125

No Description Available

#121

No Description Available

#120

No Description Available

#119

No Description Available

#118

No Description Available

125 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#178) Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae - Pending Unfair Competition Law Practitioners and Scholars in 21-16506, 21-16695 reply to response (motion to become amicus). Date of service: 06/09/2022. [12467944] [21-16506, 21-16695] (Kesselman, David) [Entered: 06/09/2022 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#177) Received 6 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 173 ] filed by Unfair Competition Law Practitioners and Scholars. [12464446] [21-16506, 21-16695] (SD) [Entered: 06/06/2022 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#176) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Motion [ # 173 ] and opposition [ # 175 ] (ECF Filing) is referred to panel.; Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus is referred to panel. (see attached PDF for complete order addressing Dkt No. 173) [12463052] [21-16506, 21-16695] (GS) [Entered: 06/03/2022 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#175) Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. in 21-16506, Appellant Apple, Inc. in 21-16695 response opposing motion ([ # 173 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 173 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus). Date of service: 06/02/2022. [12462020] [21-16506, 21-16695] (Perry, Mark) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Docket(#174) Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Unfair Competition Law Practitioners and Scholars. [12461896] [21-16506, 21-16695] (LA) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#173) Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by UCL Practitioners and Scholars. Date of service: 06/01/2022. [12461615] [21-16506, 21-16695] (Kesselman, David) [Entered: 06/01/2022 08:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#172) Received 3 paper copies of further excerpts of record [ # 164 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellant Epic Games, Inc. [12460123] [21-16506, 21-16695] (SD) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#171) Received 6 paper copies of Third Brief on Cross-Appeal [ # 163 ] filed by Epic Games, Inc.. [12460114] [21-16506, 21-16695] (SD) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docket(#170) Streamlined request [169] by Appellee Apple, Inc. in 21-16506, Appellant Apple, Inc. in 21-16695 to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: the optional reply brief is due 07/15/2022. [12458164] [21-16506, 21-16695] (JN) [Entered: 05/27/2022 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docket(#169) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Cross-Appeal Reply Brief by Appellee Apple, Inc. in 21-16506, Appellant Apple, Inc. in 21-16695. New requested due date is 07/15/2022. [12458101] [21-16506, 21-16695] (Perry, Mark) [Entered: 05/27/2022 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
158 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Epic Games, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/20/2021. [12234016] [21-16506] (Forrest, Katherine) [Entered: 09/20/2021 07:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Samuel Eckman for party(s) Appellee Apple, Inc., in case 21-16506. [12227974] (DJV) [Entered: 09/14/2021 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Joshua M. Wesneski, Mark Andrew Perry, Rachel Susan Brass, Julian Kleinbrodt, Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. for party(s) Appellee Apple, Inc., in case 21-16506. [12227965] (DJV) [Entered: 09/14/2021 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Samuel Eckman (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 333 South Grand Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellee Apple, Inc.. Date of service: 09/14/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12227960] [21-16506] (Eckman, Samuel) [Entered: 09/14/2021 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 333 South Grand Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellee Apple, Inc.. Date of service: 09/14/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12227950] [21-16506] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 09/14/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Julian Wolfe Kleinbrodt (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 555 Mission Street, Suite 3000 San Francisco, CA 94105) for Appellee Apple, Inc.. Date of service: 09/14/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12227943] [21-16506] (Kleinbrodt, Julian) [Entered: 09/14/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rachel S. Brass (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 555 Mission Street, Suite 3000 San Francisco, CA 94105) for Appellee Apple, Inc.. Date of service: 09/14/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12227936] [21-16506] (Brass, Rachel) [Entered: 09/14/2021 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua M. Wesneski (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 1050 Connecticut Ave, NW Washington, DC 20036) for Appellee Apple, Inc.. Date of service: 09/14/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12227934] [21-16506] (Wesneski, Joshua) [Entered: 09/14/2021 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mark A. Perry (Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 1050 Connecticut Ave, NW Washington, DC 20036) for Appellee Apple, Inc.. Date of service: 09/14/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12227932] [21-16506] (Perry, Mark) [Entered: 09/14/2021 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Epic Games, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/20/2021. Transcript ordered by 10/12/2021. Transcript due 11/12/2021. Appellant Epic Games, Inc. opening brief due 12/21/2021. Appellee Apple, Inc. answering brief due 01/20/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12226567] (JBS) [Entered: 09/13/2021 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Basecamp Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tile, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE is a litigant