This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/19/2019 at 06:09:06 (UTC).

Enventure Global Tech. v. Mohawk Energy, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Enventure Global Tech filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mohawk Energy, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1434

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

3Rd Party Defendants

SHELL INTERNATIONAL EXPLORATION AND PRODUCTION, INC.

SHELL OIL COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellee

ENVENTURE GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY INC.

3Rd Party Plaintiff

MOHAWK ENERGY, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Myall S. Hawkins

Lisa Meyerhoff

3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Michael Adams Esq.

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Enventure Global Technology Inc.. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [592004] [19-1434] [Lisa Meyerhoff] [Entered: 03/11/2019 05:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Enventure Global Technology Inc.. Service: 03/11/2019 by email. [592003] [19-1434] [Lisa Meyerhoff] [Entered: 03/11/2019 05:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 8 ] filed by Appellant Mohawk Energy, Ltd. Appellant's brief is due 04/02/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [591455] [MMA] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docket(#9) Notice to counsel for Appellee Enventure Global Technology Inc.: The record of this case indicates that the Certificate of Interest and Docketing Statement have not been filed. A completed certificate of Interest, and docketing statement must be submitted in accordance with Fed. Cir. R. 47.4; Fed. Cir. R. 33.1 by 03/11/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [591448]--[Edited 03/11/2019 by MMA to reflect correct documents due] [MMA] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION of Appellant Mohawk Energy, Ltd. to extend the time to 04/02/2019 to file the Appellant's Opening Brief, which is presently due on March 19, 2019.. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 03/06/2019 by email. [590900] [19-1434] [Eric Adams] [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Myall S. Hawkins as of counsel for Appellee Enventure Global Technology Inc.. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [586129] [19-1434] [Myall Hawkins] [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Lisa H. Meyerhoff as principal counsel for Appellee Enventure Global Technology Inc.. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [585898] [19-1434] [Lisa Meyerhoff] [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Mohawk Energy, Ltd. indicating that a request is made to the reporter for a transcript. Service: 02/05/2019 by clerk. [583554] [MMA] [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Mohawk Energy, Ltd.. Service: 01/29/2019 by email. [581862] [19-1434] [Eric Adams] [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Mohawk Energy, Ltd.. Service: 01/29/2019 by email. [581861] [19-1434] [Eric Adams] [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Eric M. Adams as principal counsel for Appellant Mohawk Energy, Ltd.. Service: 01/29/2019 by email. [581860] [19-1434] [Eric Adams] [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/16/2019. [579384] Entry of Appearance due 02/01/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/01/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/01/2019. Appellant's brief is due 03/19/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less