This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2019 at 06:07:40 (UTC).

Engelman Berger, PC v. Michael Singer, et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 Engelman Berger, PC filed an Other lawsuit against Michael Singer. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1262

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

ENGELMAN BERGER, PC

Debtors and Appellees

In re: MJW FILMS, LLC

J WICK PRODUCTIONS, LLC

Appellees

UNSECURED CREDITORS COMMITTEE

SAM X. EYDE

MICHAEL SINGER

UST- UNITED STATES TRUSTEE, PHOENIX

230 North 1St Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85003

J WICK PRODUCTIONS, LLC

MJW FILMS, LLC

1166 E. Warner Road

Gilbert, AZ 85296

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Susan M. Freeman Esquire

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

201 East Washington Street

Phoenix, AZ

Justin Henderson

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP

201 East Washington Street

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Robert Marshall Charles Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP

One S. Church Avenue

Tucson, AZ 85701-1611

Appellee Attorneys

Grant Cartwright Esquire

Attorney at MAY POTENZA BARAN & GILLESPIE PC

201 N. Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Andrew A. Harnisch Esquire

Attorney at May Potenza Baran & Gillespie, P.C.

201 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Norman C. Witte Esquire

Attorney at Witte Law Offices, PLLC

119 East Kalamazoo

Lansing, MI 48933

William D. Tomblin Esquire

Attorney at William D. Tomblin & Associates

Post Office Box 4783

East Lansing, MI 48826-4783

Howard I. Camhi

Attorney at Ervin Cohen and Jessup

9401 Wilshire Blvd

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Lawrence D. Hirsch

Attorney at Parker Schwartz, PLLC

7310 N. 16 Street

Phoenix, AZ 85020

Steven S. Davis Esquire

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson, LLP

10880 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90024

ust- United States Trustee, Phoenix

Attorney at Office of The United States Trustee

230 North 1St Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85003

Frederick J. Petersen Esquire

Attorney at Mesch, Clark & Rothschild, P.C.

259 N. Meyer Avenue

Tucson, AZ 85701-0000

Isaac D. Rothschild

Attorney at Mesch, Clark & Rothschild, P.C.

259 N. Meyer Avenue

Tucson, AZ 85701-0000

MJW Films, LLC

1166 E. Warner Road

Gilbert, AZ 85296

 

Court Documents

5 #3

notice of Appeal

5 #2

Election to District Court

5 #1

District Court Notice Sent

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Lawrence D. Hirsch for Appellee Michael Singer's Objection to BAP jurisdiction; served on 10/31/2019 US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Camhi, Cartwright, Davis, Harnisch, Hirsch, MJW Films, LLC, Petersen, Rothschild, Tomblin, UST/PHX, Witte; Attorney for Appellants: Charles, Freeman, Henderson. [19-1262] (LDH) [Entered: 10/31/2019 04:29 PM]

#3

(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER to appellant Engelman Berger, PC. Copies to all parties. Appellant Engelman Berger, PC's opening brief due 12/09/2019. (PI) [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:37 PM]

2 #3

Bankruptcy Court Notice Form

#2

form(s) sent

2 #1

Opening Letter

#1

(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 10/18/2019, notice of referral, transmittal form, and copies of orders. (PI) [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:21 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • (#6) CLOSED: Case closed: Election without judicial action; 11/04/2019 AZ-19-1262 Transferred by election. (VJ) [Entered: 11/04/2019 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY UPDATED. Notice sent 11/04/2019 to District Court transferring appeal per objection..--[Edited 11/19/2019 by VJ] copy sent to District court (VJ) [Entered: 11/04/2019 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Lawrence D. Hirsch for Appellee Michael Singer's Objection to BAP jurisdiction; served on 10/31/2019 US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Camhi, Cartwright, Davis, Harnisch, Hirsch, MJW Films, LLC, Petersen, Rothschild, Tomblin, UST/PHX, Witte; Attorney for Appellants: Charles, Freeman, Henderson. [19-1262] (LDH) [Entered: 10/31/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER to appellant Engelman Berger, PC. Copies to all parties. Appellant Engelman Berger, PC's opening brief due 12/09/2019. (PI) [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: AZ-19-1262. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (PI) [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 10/18/2019, notice of referral, transmittal form, and copies of orders. (PI) [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J Wick Productions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MJW Films, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UST- UNITED STATES TRUSTEE, SAN FRANCISCO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan M Freeman