This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/26/2021 at 06:08:45 (UTC).

Empls Ret Sys of St. Louis, et al v. Charles Jones, et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Empls Ret Sys of St Louis filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Charles Jones. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3993

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendant

CHARLES E. JONES

Plaintiff / Appellees

EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. LOUIS, Derivatively on behalf of FirstEnergy Corp.

ELECTRICAL WORKERS PENSION FUND, LOCAL 103, I.B.E.W., Co-Lead Plaintiff - Case No. 2:20-cv-5128

MASSACHUSETTS LABORERS PENSION FUND, Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp. Case No. 2:20-cv-5237

ROBERTA BLOOM, Case No. 2:20-cv-4534

JOAN RANDELL, Case No. 2:20-cv-4534

ARLENE POGOLOWITZ, Case No. 2:20-cv-4534

JAMES ATHERTON, Case No. 2:20-cv-5610

Defendant / Appellants

FIRSTENERGY CORP

FIRSTENERGY CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Richard Stuart Wayne

150 E. Fourth Street, Fourth Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45202

John C. Camillus

Attorney at Law Offices

P.O. Box 141410

Columbus, OH 43214

Thomas Curry

Attorney at Saxena White

1000 N. West Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jeroen Van Kwawegen

Attorney at Bernstein, Litowitz, Berger & Grossmann

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 44Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Alla Zayenchik

Attorney at Bernstein, Litowitz, Berger & Grossmann

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 44Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Donald W. Davis Jr.

75 E. Market Street

Akron, OH 44308

Molly Judith Bowen

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll

1100 New York Avenue, N.W., Fifth Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Amy R. Miller

Attorney at Cohen, Milstein, Sellers & Toll

88 Pine Street, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

David P. Meyer

Attorney at Law Office

1320 Dublin Road, Suite 100

Columbus, OH 43206

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Kathleen A. Nitschke

Attorney at Giffen & Kaminski

1300 E. Ninth Street, Suite 1600

Cleveland, OH 44114

John Gleeson

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Kerin Lyn Kaminski

Attorney at Giffen & Kaminski

1300 E. Ninth Street, Suite 1600

Cleveland, OH 44114

Maeve O'Connor

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

27 #2

judge order filed

27 #1

Cover Letter

#26

(#26) REPLY filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp. regarding Motion to Expedite, Consolidate, and Stay Certificate of Service: 12/03/2021. [21-3993] (JG) [Entered: 12/03/2021 10:41 PM]

#25

(#25) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund by Molly Bowen. Certificate of Service: 11/29/2019. [21-3993] (MJB) [Entered: 11/29/2021 02:24 PM]

#24

(#24) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to consolidate, [ # 21 ]; previously filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp., regarding a motion to expedite briefing schedule, [ # 21 ]; previously filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp., regarding a motion stay district court proceeding, [ # 21 ]; previously filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp.. Response from Attorney Mr. John C. Camillus for Appellees Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. Certificate of Service: 11/26/2021. [21-3993] (JCC) [Entered: 11/26/2021 10:03 PM]

#23

(#23) REPLY filed by Mr. John C. Camillus for Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund regardingCertificate of Service: 11/19/2021. [21-3993] (JCC) [Entered: 11/19/2021 10:16 PM]

#22

(#22) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. by Alla Zayenchik. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2021. [21-3993] (AZ) [Entered: 11/16/2021 04:15 PM]

#21

(#21) MOTION filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp. to consolidate cases 21-4037, In re FirstEnergy Corp., 21-4041, In re FirstEnergy Corp., 21-3854, Miller v. Anderson, et al.;, to expedite briefing schedule, to stay district court proceeding. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2021. [21-3993] (JG) [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:18 PM]

#20

(#20) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 5 ]; previously filed by Mr. John C. Camillus for Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. Response from Attorney Mr. John Gleeson for Appellant FirstEnergy Corp.. Certificate of Service: 11/12/2021. [21-3993] (JG) [Entered: 11/12/2021 01:33 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant FirstEnergy Corp by Maeve O'Connor. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2021. [21-3993] (MO) [Entered: 11/07/2021 07:53 PM]

#8

(#8) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 7 ], filed by Ms. Maeve O'Connor for FirstEnergy Corp is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 11/12/2021. (RGF) [Entered: 11/05/2021 04:48 PM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund by Amy Miller. Certificate of Service: 11/03/2021. [21-3993] (ARM) [Entered: 11/03/2021 01:15 PM]

5 #2

Additional Document

5 #1

motion

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund by John Camillus. Certificate of Service: 11/02/2021. [21-3993] (JCC) [Entered: 11/02/2021 11:13 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. by Jeroen van Kwawegen. Certificate of Service: 10/28/2021. [21-3993] (JV) [Entered: 10/28/2021 05:50 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant FirstEnergy Corp. Transcript needed: y. (JAC) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:05 PM]

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER filed: The motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction in No. 21-3993 [ # 5 ] is GRANTED, the petition for a writ of mandamus in No. 21-4041 [ # 6702751-2 ] is DENIED, and the motions to expedite, consolidate, and stay pending appeal in Nos. 21-3993 [ # 21 ] and 21-4041 [ # 6707040-2 ] are DENIED AS MOOT. Eugene E. Siler, Jr., Circuit Judge; Eric L. Clay, Circuit Judge and David W. McKeague, Circuit Judge. [21-3993, 21-4041] (JAC) [Entered: 12/16/2021 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp. regarding Motion to Expedite, Consolidate, and Stay Certificate of Service: 12/03/2021. [21-3993] (JG) [Entered: 12/03/2021 10:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund by Molly Bowen. Certificate of Service: 11/29/2019. [21-3993] (MJB) [Entered: 11/29/2021 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to consolidate, [ # 21 ]; previously filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp., regarding a motion to expedite briefing schedule, [ # 21 ]; previously filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp., regarding a motion stay district court proceeding, [ # 21 ]; previously filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp.. Response from Attorney Mr. John C. Camillus for Appellees Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. Certificate of Service: 11/26/2021. [21-3993] (JCC) [Entered: 11/26/2021 10:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY filed by Mr. John C. Camillus for Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund regardingCertificate of Service: 11/19/2021. [21-3993] (JCC) [Entered: 11/19/2021 10:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. by Alla Zayenchik. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2021. [21-3993] (AZ) [Entered: 11/16/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp. to consolidate cases 21-4037, In re FirstEnergy Corp., 21-4041, In re FirstEnergy Corp., 21-3854, Miller v. Anderson, et al.;, to expedite briefing schedule, to stay district court proceeding. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2021. [21-3993] (JG) [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 5 ]; previously filed by Mr. John C. Camillus for Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. Response from Attorney Mr. John Gleeson for Appellant FirstEnergy Corp.. Certificate of Service: 11/12/2021. [21-3993] (JG) [Entered: 11/12/2021 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. John Gleeson for Appellant FirstEnergy Corp... Certificate of Service: 11/10/2021. [21-3993] (JG) [Entered: 11/10/2021 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant FirstEnergy Corp. by Kathleen A. Nitschke. Certificate of Service: 11/10/2021. [21-3993] (KAN) [Entered: 11/10/2021 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant FirstEnergy Corp by Maeve O'Connor. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2021. [21-3993] (MO) [Entered: 11/07/2021 07:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docket(#9) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Ms. Maeve O'Connor for FirstEnergy Corp. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2021. [21-3993] (MO) [Entered: 11/05/2021 07:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 7 ], filed by Ms. Maeve O'Connor for FirstEnergy Corp is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 11/12/2021. (RGF) [Entered: 11/05/2021 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) *** DOCUMENT LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF DOCUMENT *** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant FirstEnergy Corp by Maeve O'Connor. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2021. [21-3993]--[Edited 11/08/2021 by JAC] (MO) [Entered: 11/05/2021 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund by Amy Miller. Certificate of Service: 11/03/2021. [21-3993] (ARM) [Entered: 11/03/2021 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION filed by Mr. John C. Camillus for Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 11/02/2021. [21-3993] (JCC) [Entered: 11/02/2021 11:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund by John Camillus. Certificate of Service: 11/02/2021. [21-3993] (JCC) [Entered: 11/02/2021 11:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. by Jeroen van Kwawegen. Certificate of Service: 10/28/2021. [21-3993] (JV) [Entered: 10/28/2021 05:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Julie Connor (JAC) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant FirstEnergy Corp. Transcript needed: y. (JAC) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W. is a litigant

Latest cases where FirstEnergy Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maeve O'Connor Esq.