Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 06:26:27 (UTC).

Emily Roe, et al v. Stanford Health Care, et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Emily Roe filed an Other lawsuit against Stanford Health Care. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55874

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, Interested Party

Defendant / Appellees

FREDERICK DIRBAS, Dr.

THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDRENS HOSPITAL AT STANDORD

THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE STANFORD HEALTH CARE

THE LELAND JUNIOR UNIVERSITY

DEBRA ZUMWALT

THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF STANFORD UNIVERSITY

STANFORD HEALTH CARE ADVANTAGE

STANFORD HEALTH CARE, FKA Stanford Hospitals and Clinics

STANFORD HEALTHCARE BILLING DEPARTMENT

Plaintiff / Appellant

EMILY ROE, Relator; ex. rel. United States of America; ex. rel. State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kimberly K. Chemerinsky

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

333 S. Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2901

Frank E. Sheeder III

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Gloria M. Juarez

Attorney at Law Offices of Gloria Juarez

26081 Merit Circle

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Gloria M. Juarez Esquire

Attorney at Law Offices of Gloria Juarez

26081 Merit Circle

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/23/2020, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. See order for details. [11868445] (VS) [Entered: 10/22/2020 11:42 AM]

#17

(#17) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellant and appellant,10/22/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellees,10/22/2020, 10:30 a.m. PacificSee order for details. [11858891] (VS) [Entered: 10/14/2020 03:34 PM]

#14

(#14) Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) The court has received appellees objection to the reply in support of the emergency motion and appellants objection to appellees objection (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 12 ], [ # 13 ]). The Clerk will maintain appellants reply in support of the motion (Docket Entry No. [10]) under seal. The emergency motion for a stay pending appeal of the district courts August 21, 2020 order and July 13, 2020 order (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is granted. See Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418 (2009). The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11826854] (JMR) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:44 PM]

#13

(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe reply to response (motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 09/15/2020. [11825271] [20-55874] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:37 PM]

#12

(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Debra Zumwalt, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage and The Leland Junior University Correspondence: Objection to Reply (ECF 10). Date of service: 09/14/2020 [11823586] [20-55874] (Sheeder, Frank) [Entered: 09/14/2020 06:08 PM]

#11

(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe Correspondence: Amended certificate of service for motion to stay order pending appeal. Date of service: 09/13/2020. [11821611] [20-55874]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 09/14/2020 by SLM] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 09/13/2020 04:36 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage, The Board of Trustees of Stanford University, The Leland Junior University and Debra Zumwalt response to motion ([ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/11/2020. [11821344] [20-55874] (Sheeder, Frank) [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:52 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: M-KS): The court has received appellants emergency motion to stay the district courts August 21, 2020 order pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]). The response is due September 11, 2020, by 5:00 p.m. PDT. The reply in support of the motion is due September 14, 2020, by 12:00 p.m. PDT. [11818263] (AF) [Entered: 09/09/2020 05:18 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 09/08/2020. [11816867] [20-55874] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 9/9/2020 by TYL] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 09/08/2020 11:49 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 10/14/2020, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11812284] (VS) [Entered: 09/03/2020 11:53 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/31/2020. [11808042] [20-55874] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 08/31/2020 02:21 PM]

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/23/2020, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. See order for details. [11868445] (VS) [Entered: 10/22/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellant and appellant,10/22/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellees,10/22/2020, 10:30 a.m. PacificSee order for details. [11858891] (VS) [Entered: 10/14/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#16) Streamlined request [15] by Appellant Emily Roe to extend time to file the brief is approved in part. Streamlined requests only allow for a 30 day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Emily Roe opening brief due 11/25/2020. Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage, Stanford Healthcare Billing Department, The Board of Directors of the Lucile Salter Packard Childrens Hospital at Standord, The Board of Directors of the Stanford Health Care, The Board of Trustees of Stanford University, The Leland Junior University and Debra Zumwalt answering brief due 12/28/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11857130] (JN) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#15) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Emily Roe. New requested due date is 11/27/2020. [11857026] [20-55874] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) The court has received appellees objection to the reply in support of the emergency motion and appellants objection to appellees objection (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 12 ], [ # 13 ]). The Clerk will maintain appellants reply in support of the motion (Docket Entry No. [10]) under seal. The emergency motion for a stay pending appeal of the district courts August 21, 2020 order and July 13, 2020 order (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is granted. See Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418 (2009). The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11826854] (JMR) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe reply to response (motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 09/15/2020. [11825271] [20-55874] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Debra Zumwalt, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage and The Leland Junior University Correspondence: Objection to Reply (ECF 10). Date of service: 09/14/2020 [11823586] [20-55874] (Sheeder, Frank) [Entered: 09/14/2020 06:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe Correspondence: Amended certificate of service for motion to stay order pending appeal. Date of service: 09/13/2020. [11821611] [20-55874]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 09/14/2020 by SLM] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 09/13/2020 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2020
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe reply to response (). Date of service: 09/13/2020. [11821610] [20-55874]--[Edited: sealed per order [ # 14 ]. 09/16/2020 by SLM] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 09/13/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage, The Board of Trustees of Stanford University, The Leland Junior University and Debra Zumwalt response to motion ([ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/11/2020. [11821344] [20-55874] (Sheeder, Frank) [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Frank E. Sheeder III for party(s) Appellee Debra Zumwalt, Appellee The Leland Junior University, Appellee Frederick Dirbas, Appellee Stanford Health Care Advantage, Appellee The Board of Trustees of Stanford University and Appellee Stanford Health Care, in case 20-55874. [11820416] (QDL) [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Frank E. Sheeder, III (Alston & Bird LLP, 2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2300, Dallas, Texas 75201) for Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage, The Board of Trustees of Stanford University, The Leland Junior University and Debra Zumwalt. Date of service: 09/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11820394] [20-55874] (Sheeder, Frank) [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: M-KS): The court has received appellants emergency motion to stay the district courts August 21, 2020 order pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]). The response is due September 11, 2020, by 5:00 p.m. PDT. The reply in support of the motion is due September 14, 2020, by 12:00 p.m. PDT. [11818263] (AF) [Entered: 09/09/2020 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 09/08/2020. [11816867] [20-55874] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 9/9/2020 by TYL] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 09/08/2020 11:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 10/14/2020, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11812284] (VS) [Entered: 09/03/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/31/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11808652]. [20-55874] (AD) [Entered: 08/31/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Emily Roe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/31/2020. [11808042] [20-55874] (Juarez, Gloria) [Entered: 08/31/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Emily Roe Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/01/2020. Appellant Emily Roe opening brief due 10/26/2020. Appellees Frederick Dirbas, Stanford Health Care, Stanford Health Care Advantage, Stanford Healthcare Billing Department, The Board of Directors of the Lucile Salter Packard Childrens Hospital at Standord, The Board of Directors of the Stanford Health Care, The Board of Trustees of Stanford University, The Leland Junior University and Debra Zumwalt answering brief due 11/27/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11802204] (RT) [Entered: 08/25/2020 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stanford Health Care Advantage is a litigant

Latest cases where STANFORD HEALTH CARE A NONPROFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant