This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:15 (UTC).

Emily Lockhart v. Andrew Saul

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Emily Lockhart filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Andrew Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2333

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellant

EMILY S. LOCKHART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Tina L. Nommay

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

1300 S. Harrison Street, 3128 Federal Building

Fort Wayne, IN 46802-0000

Daniel Balsam

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

6401 Security Boulevard

Baltimore, MD 21235-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Randal S. Forbes

Attorney at FORBES LAW OFFICE

3472 N. Wayne Street, P.O. Box 374

Angola, IN 46703

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 3 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 09/23/2019 for Emily S. Lockhart. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/23/2019 for Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/13/2019 for Appellant Emily S. Lockhart. CMD [4] [7025784] [19-2333] (AG) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:00 AM]

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Removed as Entered in Error

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 3 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 09/23/2019 for Emily S. Lockhart. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/23/2019 for Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/13/2019 for Appellant Emily S. Lockhart. CMD [4] [7025784] [19-2333] (AG) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion filed by Appellant Emily S. Lockhart to extend time to file appellant brief. [3] [7025720] [19-2333] (Forbes, Randal) [Entered: 08/23/2019 11:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed Notice of Appearance by Appellee Andrew M. Saul. [2] [7023873] [19-2333] (Balsam, Daniel) [Entered: 08/15/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) U.S. civil case docketed. Fee due. IFP. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 07/29/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 07/29/2019 for Appellant Emily S. Lockhart. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/26/2019 for Emily S. Lockhart. [1] [7017299] [19-2333] [1] [7017299] [19-2333]--[Edited 07/16/2019 by CMD to reflect IFP and set appellant's brief deadline.] (CAG) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less