Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2020 at 06:10:30 (UTC).

Emiabata v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Emiabata filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Bank of New York Mellon Trust. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2738

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sylvia Emiabata, DBA Nova Express

Defendant / Appellees

Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, Substitute Trustee and Original Trustee

Avail I. LLC

Morgan Chase Bank Washington Mutual Bank, (BSI)

Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.

Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, (SLS)

JP Morgan Chase & Co.

Plaintiff / Appellant

Philip Emiabata, DBA Nova Express

Fairfield, CT 06824

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mark Hopkins Esq.

Attorney at Hopkins Law, PLLC

3 Lakeway Centre Court

Austin, TX 78734

Brian D. Rich Esq.

Attorney at Halloran & Sage, LLP

1 Goodwin Square, 225 Asylum Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Shelley Hopkins Esq.

Attorney at Hopkins Law, PLLC

3 Lakeway Centre Court

Austin, TX 78734

Kevin Patrick Polansky Esq.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

1 Post Office Square

Boston, MA 02109

Kenneth John McDonnell

Attorney at Gould, Larson, Bennet, Wells & McDonald

35 Plains Road, P.O. Box 959

Essex, CT 06426

Christopher K. Friedman Esq.

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP

1600 Division Street

Nashville, TN 37203

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Philip Emiabata

857 Post Road, #139

Fairfield, CT 06824

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [55], on behalf of Appellant Philip Emiabata, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2939688] [20-2738] [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:07 PM]

#58

(#58) PAPERS, District Court orders, copy of the Notice of Appeal, Judgment, RECEIVED.[2939681] [20-2738] [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:00 PM]

#41

No Description Available

#40

No Description Available

#37

No Description Available

#46

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#14

(#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Akcnowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellee Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2917356] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:30 PM]

#5

No Description Available

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#7

(#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2910756] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:48 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket(#62) ATTORNEY, Kevin P. Polansky, for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., TERMINATED.[2939829] [20-2989] [Entered: 09/28/2020 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Oral Argument Statement LR 34.1 (a), [57], on behalf of Appellant Philip Emiabata, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2939704] [20-2738] [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [56], on behalf of Appellant Philip Emiabata, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2939700] [20-2738] [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [55], on behalf of Appellant Philip Emiabata, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2939688] [20-2738] [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) PAPERS, District Court orders, copy of the Notice of Appeal, Judgment, RECEIVED.[2939681] [20-2738] [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#57) ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Appellant Philip Emiabata, FILED. No service date. [2939534] [20-2738] [Entered: 09/28/2020 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#56) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Philip Emiabata, FILED. Service date 09/23/2020 by US mail.[2939531] [20-2738] [Entered: 09/28/2020 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#55) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Philip Emiabata, FILED. Service date 09/23/2020 by US mail.[2939529] [20-2738] [Entered: 09/28/2020 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by US mail.[2936323] [20-2738] [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docket(#53) ATTORNEY, Shelley Hopkins for Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, in case 20-2989 Shelley Hopkins for Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, in case 20-2738, [ # 50 ], ADDED.[2936304] [20-2738, 20-2989] [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel, [12], on behalf of Appellee Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2917362] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Akcnowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellee Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2917356] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, FILED. Service date 08/26/2020 by CM/ECF.[2917071] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/26/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, FILED. Service date 08/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2916018] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, FILED. Service date 08/25/2020 by CM/ECF.[2916001] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2910756] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#6) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Mark Hopkins for Appellee Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2910753] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2910751] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 07/16/2020, RECEIVED.[2910730] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Philip Emiabata, FILED. [2910722] [20-2738] [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner Engle, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant