This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/01/2022 at 06:23:23 (UTC).

EMI Blackwood Music Inc. v. Vimeo, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 EMI Blackwood Music Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Vimeo, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2974

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Defendant

Does, 1-20 inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellants

EMI Blackwood Music Inc., a Connecticut Corporation

EMI April Music Inc., a Connecticut Corporation

EMI Virgin Music, Inc., a New York Corporation

Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., a Delaware Corporation

EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., a New York Corporation

EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., a New York Corporation

EMI Unart Catalog Inc., a New York Corporation

Stone Diamond Music Corporation, a Michigan Corporation

EMI U Catalog Inc., a New York Corporation

Jobete Music Co., Inc., a Michigan Corporation

Defendant / Appellees

Vimeo, Inc., a Delaware Limited Liability company, AKA Vimeo.com

Connected Ventures, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company

Amicus Curiae

National Music Publishers' Association, Inc.

Recording Industry Association of America, Inc.

Copyright Alliance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Russell J. Frackman Esq.

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

2049 Century Park East, 18Th Flor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Catherine Emily Stetson

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky Esq.

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Todd Anten Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Robert Lloyd Raskopf Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Michael Andrew Cheah Esq.

Attorney at IAC/InterActiveCorp

555 West 18Th Street

New York, NY 10011

Kathleen M. Sullivan

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

865 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Hyland Hunt

Attorney at Deutsch Hunt PLLC

300 New Jersey Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#61

No Description Available

#88

(#79) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Connected Ventures, LLC and Vimeo, Inc. in 21-2949 Brief due date as 07/12/2022, FILED.[3303114] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:17 PM]

#84

(#75) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Music Publishers' Association, Inc., Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. and Copyright Alliance, FILED. Service date 04/19/2022 by CM/ECF. [3299906] [21-2949, 21-2974]--[Edited 04/20/2022 by BM] [Entered: 04/19/2022 04:09 PM]

#82

(#74) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Vimeo, Inc. and Connected Ventures, LLC in 21-2949, 21-2974, informing Court of proposed due date 07/12/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 04/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3298229] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/15/2022 05:39 PM]

#80

(#72) SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, to file a deferred appendix pursuant to FRAP 30(c) and Local Rule 30.1(c)., FILED.[3296670] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/14/2022 10:12 AM]

#78

(#70) PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation and Virgin Records America, Inc. in 21-2949, Appellant Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc. and Stone Diamond Music Corporation in 21-2974, FILED. Service date 04/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3296366] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/13/2022 04:13 PM]

#76

(#68) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [67], on behalf of Appellant Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation and Virgin Records America, Inc. in 21-2949, FILED.[3296300] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/13/2022 03:38 PM]

#74

(#66) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3293727] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/08/2022 11:20 AM]

#71

No Description Available

#70

No Description Available

#67

No Description Available

#66

No Description Available

#65

No Description Available

#58

No Description Available

#57

No Description Available

#56

No Description Available

#52

No Description Available

#49

No Description Available

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Connected Ventures, LLC and Vimeo, Inc. in 21-2949 Brief due date as 07/12/2022, FILED.[3303114] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Docket(#77) NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae National Music Publishers' Association, Inc., Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. and Copyright Alliance in 21-2949 and Amicus Curiae National Music Publishers' Association, Inc., Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. and Copyright Alliance in 21-2974, ADDED.[3300209] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/20/2022 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Music Publishers' Association, Inc., Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. and Copyright Alliance, FILED. Service date 04/19/2022 by CM/ECF. [3299906] [21-2949, 21-2974]--[Edited 04/20/2022 by BM] [Entered: 04/19/2022 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Vimeo, Inc. and Connected Ventures, LLC in 21-2949, 21-2974, informing Court of proposed due date 07/12/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 04/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3298229] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/15/2022 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docket(#73) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: BRIEF [ # 68 ], on behalf of Appellant Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation, Virgin Records America, Inc. and Appellee Connected Ventures, LLC and Vimeo, Inc. in 21-2949, Does, Appellant Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation and Appellee Connected Ventures, LLC and Vimeo, Inc. in 21-2974, FILED.[3296674] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/14/2022 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, to file a deferred appendix pursuant to FRAP 30(c) and Local Rule 30.1(c)., FILED.[3296670] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/14/2022 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation and Virgin Records America, Inc. in 21-2949, Appellant Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc. and Stone Diamond Music Corporation in 21-2974, FILED. Service date 04/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3296366] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/13/2022 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [67], on behalf of Appellant Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation and Virgin Records America, Inc. in 21-2949, FILED.[3296300] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/13/2022 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Docket(#67) PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Capitol Records, LLC, Caroline Records, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corporation and Virgin Records America, Inc. in 21-2949, Appellant Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc. and Stone Diamond Music Corporation in 21-2974, FILED. Service date 04/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3295721] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/12/2022 07:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3293727] [21-2949, 21-2974] [Entered: 04/08/2022 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Vimeo, Inc. and Connected Ventures, LLC, FILED. Service date 12/10/2021 by CM/ECF. [3226610] [21-2974] [Entered: 12/10/2021 06:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Vimeo, Inc. and Connected Ventures, LLC, FILED. Service date 12/10/2021 by CM/ECF.[3226587] [21-2974] [Entered: 12/10/2021 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY, Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky for Appellants EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc. and Stone Diamond Music Corporation, in case 21-2974 , [ # 10 ], ADDED.[3225978] [21-2974] [Entered: 12/09/2021 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Catherine Emily Stetson for Appellants EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc.and Stone Diamond Music Corporation, in case 21-2974 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3225976] [21-2974] [Entered: 12/09/2021 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc. and Stone Diamond Music Corporation, FILED. Service date 12/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3225139] [21-2974] [Entered: 12/08/2021 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc. and Stone Diamond Music Corporation, FILED. Service date 12/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3225130] [21-2974] [Entered: 12/08/2021 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3222007] [21-2974] [Entered: 12/03/2021 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3222003] [21-2974] [Entered: 12/03/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc. and Stone Diamond Music Corporation, district court receipt # ANYSDC-25408550, FILED.[3222000] [21-2974] [Entered: 12/03/2021 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Colgems-EMI Music, Inc., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Gold Horizon Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., EMI Virgin Music, Inc., EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Jobete Music Co., Inc. and Stone Diamond Music Corporation, FILED. [3221983] [21-2974] [Entered: 12/03/2021 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Connected Ventures, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. is a litigant