This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/08/2022 at 08:52:16 (UTC).

Emhart Industries, et al v. CNA Holdings LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Emhart Industries, filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against CNA Holdings LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1563

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Defendant

NEW ENGLAND CONTAINER COMPANY INC

3Rd Party Defendants

ROHM & HAAS COMPANY

DURO TEXTILES LLC

BAYER CORPORATION

INGREDION INC

BASF CORPORATION

OLIN CORPORATION

CONOCOPHILLIPS

HENKEL CORPORATION

INDUSOL INC

Plaintiff / Appellee

EMHART INDUSTRIES, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

US NAVY

US DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE

3Rd Party Plaintiff

BLACK & DECKER, INC.

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan J. Huber

Attorney at Miles & Stockbridge PC

100 Light St

Baltimore, MD 21202-0000

Holly Drumheller Butler

Attorney at Miles & Stockbridge PC

100 Light St

Baltimore, MD 21202-0000

Emily J. Migliaccio

Attorney at Cervenka Green & Ducharme LLC

235 Promenade St, Ste 475

Providence, RI 02908

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Ryan Michael Murphy

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC

2 International Pl, 16Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-2602

Timothy I. Duffy

Attorney at Coughlin Midlige & Garland LLP

350 Mount Kemble Ave, Po Box 1917

Morristown, NJ 07962

Stephen P. Cooney

Attorney at Higgins Cavanagh & Cooney LLP

10 Dorrance St, Ste 400

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Monica R. Nelson

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

1 Citizens Plaza, Ste 1120

Providence, RI 02903

David L. Fine

Attorney at Mirick O'Connell DeMallie & Lougee LLP

100 Front St

Worcester, MA 01608-1477

Other Attorneys

Joseph E. Wolfson

Attorney at Stevens & Lee

620 Freedom Business Ctr

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

Michelle Ulick Rosenthal

Attorney at Veris Law Group PLLC

1809 7Th Ave, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98101

Susan B. Forcier

Attorney at RI Dept of Environmental Management

235 Promenade St, 4Th Flr

Providence, RI 02908-0000

Peter F. Neronha

Attorney at RI Attorney General's Office

150 S Main St

Providence, RI 02903-0000

James A. Kosch

Attorney at McCarter & English LLP

100 Mulberry St, 4 Gateway Ctr

Newark, NJ 07102-4056

Gerald J. Petros

Attorney at Hinckley Allen LLP

100 Westminster St, Ste 1500

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Douglas Jay Emanuel

Attorney at Chace Ruttenberg & Freedman LLP

1 Park Row, Ste 300

Providence, RI 02093-0000

81 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MANDATE issued. [19-1563] (GB) [Entered: 04/12/2021 06:32 AM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT entered. Affirmed . [19-1563] (GB) [Entered: 02/17/2021 03:36 PM]

Open Document

OPINION issued by David J. Barron, Appellate Judge** and Patti B. Saris,*** U.S. District Judge. Published. **Judge Torruella heard oral argument in this matter and participated in the semble, but he did not participate in the issuance of the panel's opinion in this case. The remaining two panelists therefore issued the opinion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 46(d). *** Of the District of Massachusetts, sitting by designation. [19-1563] (GB) [Entered: 02/17/2021 03:26 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Susan B. Forcier for Appellee State of Rhode Island. Certificate of service dated 09/01/2020. [19-1563] (SBF) [Entered: 09/01/2020 09:47 AM]

Open Document #2

Appendix Volume II

Open Document #1

Appendix Volume I

Open Document

DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Joseph Hovermill for Appellees Black & Decker, Inc. and Emhart Industries, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 08/31/2020. [19-1563] (JH) [Entered: 08/31/2020 10:13 AM]

Open Document #2

Appendix Volume II

Open Document #1

Appendix Volume I

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE issued. [19-1563] (GB) [Entered: 04/12/2021 06:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT entered. Affirmed . [19-1563] (GB) [Entered: 02/17/2021 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPINION issued by David J. Barron, Appellate Judge** and Patti B. Saris,*** U.S. District Judge. Published. **Judge Torruella heard oral argument in this matter and participated in the semble, but he did not participate in the issuance of the panel's opinion in this case. The remaining two panelists therefore issued the opinion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 46(d). *** Of the District of Massachusetts, sitting by designation. [19-1563] (GB) [Entered: 02/17/2021 03:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPublic docket note: John P. Roth and Thomas W. Harker were named Acting Secretaries of the United States Department of the Air Force and United States Department of the Navy as of January 20, 2021. Lloyd J. Austin, III was sworn in as Secretary of the United States Department of Defense on January 22, 2021. We have substituted them as the appellees. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [19-1563] (GB) [Entered: 02/04/2021 07:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCASE argued. Panel: Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; David J. Barron, Appellate Judge and Patti B. Saris, U.S. District Judge. Arguing attorneys: Bryan M. Killian for CNA Holdings LLC, Joseph Hovermill for Emhart Industries, Inc. and Black & Decker, Inc. and Joan M. Pepin for US, US Air Force, US Navy, US Department of Defense, Matthew P. Donovan, Mark T. Esper and Thomas B. Modly. [19-1563] (DJT) [Entered: 10/08/2020 01:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Susan B. Forcier for Appellee State of Rhode Island. Certificate of service dated 09/01/2020. [19-1563] (SBF) [Entered: 09/01/2020 09:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX filed by Appellants CNA Holdings LLC, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation and Union Oil Company of California. [19-1563] (LIM) [Entered: 08/31/2020 10:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Joseph Hovermill for Appellees Black & Decker, Inc. and Emhart Industries, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 08/31/2020. [19-1563] (JH) [Entered: 08/31/2020 10:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX tendered by Appellants CNA Holdings LLC, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation and Union Oil Company of California. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2019. [19-1563] (BMK) [Entered: 08/31/2020 09:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Joan M. Pepin for Appellees Matthew P. Donovan, Mark T. Esper, Thomas B. Modly, US, US Air Force, US Department of Defense and US Navy. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2020. [19-1563] (JMP) [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation and Union Oil Company of California filed by Attorney Lindsey C. Moorhead. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2019. [19-1563] (LCM) [Entered: 06/26/2019 09:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: James F. Thompson for ConocoPhillips. [19-1563] (GB) [Entered: 06/25/2019 02:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney James F. Thompson for Not Party ConocoPhillips. Certificate of service was not included. [19-1563] (GB) [Entered: 06/25/2019 02:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ordered: 03/19/2019, Motion Hearing. Transcript due 08/26/2019 from Court Reporter Lisa Schwam, Court Reporter [19-1563] (GB) [Entered: 06/25/2019 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants CNA Holdings LLC, Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation and Union Oil Company of California indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 06/24/2019. [19-1563] CLERK'S NOTE: Party selection was incomplete. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (DKM) [Entered: 06/24/2019 06:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant CNA Holdings LLC filed by Attorney Douglas A. Hastings. Certificate of service dated 06/24/2019. [19-1563] (DAH) [Entered: 06/24/2019 06:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant CNA Holdings LLC filed by Attorney Bryan M. Killian. Certificate of service dated 06/24/2019. [19-1563] (BMK) [Entered: 06/24/2019 06:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant CNA Holdings LLC filed by Attorney Duke K. McCall. Certificate of service dated 06/24/2019. [19-1563] (DKM) [Entered: 06/24/2019 06:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee State of Rhode Island filed by Attorney Susan B. Forcier. Certificate of service dated 06/21/2019. [19-1563] (SBF) [Entered: 06/21/2019 12:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #734) filed by Appellants CNA Holdings LLC, Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation and Union Oil Company of California. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 07/02/2019 . [19-1563] (GB) [Entered: 06/18/2019 03:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less