This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:48 (UTC).

EMED Technologies Corporation v. Repro-Med Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 EMED Technologies Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Repro-Med Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2145

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

EMED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

Defendant / Appellee

REPRO-MED SYSTEMS, INC., dba RMS Medical Products

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William Peterson Ramey III

Attorney at Ramey & Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montrose Boulevard

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert M. Isackson

Attorney at Leason Ellis LLP

One Barker Avenue

White Plains, NY 10601

Hoda Rifai-Bashjawish

Attorney at Leason Ellis LLP

One Barker Avenue, 5Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10601

Henry Gabathuler

Attorney at Leason Ellis LLP

One Barker Avenue

White Plains, NY 10601

Matthew L. Kaufman

Attorney at Leason Ellis LLP

One Barker Avenue

White Plains, NY 10601

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#10

(#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 08/05/2019 by email. [625952] [19-2145] [William Ramey] [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:36 AM]

#1

Notice of Docketing

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey, III as principal counsel for Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624675] [19-2145] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [William Ramey] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:58 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Robert M. Isackson as principal counsel for Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2019 by email. [623861] [19-2145] [Robert Isackson] [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:43 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2019 by email. [623863] [19-2145] [Robert Isackson] [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:45 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2019 by email. [623862] [19-2145] [Robert Isackson] [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:44 PM]

#13

(#13) Entry of appearance for Matthew Kaufman as of counsel for Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 08/21/2019 by email. [629828] [19-2145] [Matthew Kaufman] [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:49 AM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624671] [19-2145] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [William Ramey] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:54 PM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624674] [19-2145] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [William Ramey] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:55 PM]

#12

(#12) Entry of appearance for Hoda Rifai-Bashjawish as of counsel for Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 08/21/2019 by email. [629827] [19-2145] [Hoda Rifai-Bashjawish] [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:47 AM]

#8

(#8) }NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation, Entry of Appearance for William Ramey, Certificate of Interest and Docketing Statement [ # 7 ], [ # 6 ], [ # 5 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 08/07/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [624728] [TAM] [Entered: 07/31/2019 08:59 AM]

#15

(#15) Corrected Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey, III as of counsel for Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 09/10/2019 by email. [634253] [19-2145] [William Ramey] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:15 AM]

#11

(#11) Entry of appearance for Henry Gabathuler as of counsel for Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 08/21/2019 by email. [629825] [19-2145] [Henry Gabathuler] [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:45 AM]

#9

(#9) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 08/05/2019 by email. [625951] [19-2145] [William Ramey] [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:35 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corrected Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey, III as of counsel for Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 09/10/2019 by email. [634253] [19-2145] [William Ramey] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • (#14) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [CLERKS NOTE: A compliant Entry of Appearance (EOA) for principal counsel has not been filed for Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Please promptly file an EOA for the principal counsel. [629909] [TAM] [Entered: 08/21/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Entry of appearance for Matthew Kaufman as of counsel for Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 08/21/2019 by email. [629828] [19-2145] [Matthew Kaufman] [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Entry of appearance for Hoda Rifai-Bashjawish as of counsel for Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 08/21/2019 by email. [629827] [19-2145] [Hoda Rifai-Bashjawish] [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Henry Gabathuler as of counsel for Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 08/21/2019 by email. [629825] [19-2145] [Henry Gabathuler] [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 08/05/2019 by email. [625952] [19-2145] [William Ramey] [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 08/05/2019 by email. [625951] [19-2145] [William Ramey] [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) }NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation, Entry of Appearance for William Ramey, Certificate of Interest and Docketing Statement [ # 7 ], [ # 6 ], [ # 5 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 08/07/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [624728] [TAM] [Entered: 07/31/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for William P. Ramey, III as principal counsel for Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624675] [19-2145] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [William Ramey] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624674] [19-2145] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [William Ramey] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellant EMED Technologies Corporation. Service: 07/30/2019 by email. [624671] [19-2145] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [William Ramey] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2019 by email. [623863] [19-2145] [Robert Isackson] [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2019 by email. [623862] [19-2145] [Robert Isackson] [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Robert M. Isackson as principal counsel for Appellee Repro-Med Systems, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2019 by email. [623861] [19-2145] [Robert Isackson] [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/10/2019. [621221] Entry of Appearance due 07/30/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/30/2019. Docketing Statement due 07/30/2019. Appellant's brief is due 09/16/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.